This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 11:36:45 (UTC).

Antonio Fernandez v. Alfonso Alvarez Martinez et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Antonio Fernandez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Alfonso Alvarez Martinez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02449

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Fernandez

Defendants

Alfonso Alvarez Martinez

Arcoiris 98 Cent Store Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Isabel Rose Masanque

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Mark D Potter

Adrian Matthew Slipski

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33111941 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Arcoiris 98 Cent Store Inc., Alfonso Alvarez Martinez, Alfonso Alvarez Martinez. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Isabel Rose Masanque on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Isabel Rose Masanque added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Masanque, Isabel) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Adrian Matthew Slipski on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Adrian Matthew Slipski added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Slipski, Adrian) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer&'s Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv) (Entered: 04/16/2022)

#12

(#12) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (vv) (Entered: 04/16/2022)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Arcoiris 98 Cent Store Inc. served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Authorized Edgar Chanax -Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Arcoiris 98 Cent Store Inc. served on 5/13/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Authorized Edgar Chanax -Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (vv) (Entered: 04/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer&'s Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv) (Entered: 04/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Adrian Matthew Slipski on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Adrian Matthew Slipski added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Slipski, Adrian) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Isabel Rose Masanque on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Isabel Rose Masanque added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Masanque, Isabel) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Arcoiris 98 Cent Store Inc., Alfonso Alvarez Martinez, Alfonso Alvarez Martinez. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (et) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33111941 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less