This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 10:59:43 (UTC).

Antonio Fernandez v. Adrina Chavez et al

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 Antonio Fernandez filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Adrina Chavez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02448

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Fernandez

Defendants

Adrina Chavez

Epifania Castro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Isabel Rose Masanque

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Mark D Potter

Attorney at Potter Handy LLP

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Adrian Matthew Slipski

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

100 Pine Street Suite 1250

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Proof of Service

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has been advised that this action has been settled #14 . The Court therefore ORDERS that this action is hereby DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 60 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

14 #2

Proof of Service

14 #1

Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Epifania Castro served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#12

(#12) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (pg) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (pg) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Isabel Rose Masanque on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Isabel Rose Masanque added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Masanque, Isabel) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Adrian Matthew Slipski on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Adrian Matthew Slipski added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Slipski, Adrian) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Epifania Castro, Adrina Chavez. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33111910 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. Dismissal is With Prejudice Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has been advised that this action has been settled #14 . The Court therefore ORDERS that this action is hereby DISMISSED without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 60 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Settlement and Request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Epifania Castro served on 4/25/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (pg) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (pg) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Isabel Rose Masanque on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Isabel Rose Masanque added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Masanque, Isabel) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Adrian Matthew Slipski on behalf of Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez (Attorney Adrian Matthew Slipski added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Slipski, Adrian) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Epifania Castro, Adrina Chavez. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (sh) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33111910 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Isabel Rose Masanque

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark D. Potter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond George Ballister, Jr.