This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2021 at 10:31:55 (UTC).

Anton International, Inc. v. Chunhong Zhang et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 Anton International, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Chunhong Zhang. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00120

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.

Anton International, Inc.

Defendants

DOES 1 through 50, inclusive

CHUNHONG ZHANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thad Marvin Scroggins

Attorney at Law Office of Thad Scroggins

155 North Lake Avenue Suite 800

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen M. Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

David Shein

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #11 filed by Defendant Chunhong Zhang. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #11 filed by Plaintiff Anton International, Inc.. (Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#13

(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen M. Doniger counsel for Defendant Chunhong Zhang. Adding David Shein as counsel of record for Chunhong Zhang for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Chunhong Zhang. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#10

(#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Anton International, Inc.. (Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 as to Defendant Chunhong Zhang. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC., (Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Plaintiff ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. #11 ], is ordered CONTINUED from March 26, 2021 to April 9, 2021, at 9:00 a.m., via video conference. To obtain the video conference link for the scheduled hearing, the parties are directed to Judge Holcomb's Procedures and Schedules page on the Court's website: http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-w-holcomb. Please follow the instructions listed under "Zoom Webinar Hearings." IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #11 filed by Defendant Chunhong Zhang. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) OBJECTION in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #11 filed by Plaintiff Anton International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Objections to Declaration of Chunhong Zhang and Defendants Request for Judicial Notice)(Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #11 filed by Plaintiff Anton International, Inc.. (Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen M. Doniger counsel for Defendant Chunhong Zhang. Adding David Shein as counsel of record for Chunhong Zhang for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Chunhong Zhang. (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #11 filed by Defendant Chunhong Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Chunhong Zhang. Motion set for hearing on 3/26/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chunhong Zhang, #2 Exhibit 1 to Zhang DL, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Stephen M. Doniger added to party Chunhong Zhang(pty:dft)) (Doniger, Stephen) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Anton International, Inc.. (Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 as to Defendant Chunhong Zhang. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC., (Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Plaintiff ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (402 paid on 01/22/2021, receipt number 30185367), filed by Plaintiff ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Thad Marvin Scroggins added to party ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.(pty:pla))(Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ANTON INTERNATIONAL INC.. (Scroggins, Thad) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anton International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Shein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M Doniger