This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/04/2020 at 07:26:07 (UTC).

Anthony v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 Anthony filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa Carroll Buchanan and Leonie M. Brinkema. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01409

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aric Anthony

Defendant

Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ernest Paul Francis

Attorney at Ernest P. Francis LTD

505 Wythe St

Alexandria, VA 22314

Defendant Attorneys

Syed Mohsin Reza

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP (DC)

401 9Th St Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Ethan G. Ostroff

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP (Virginia Beach)

222 Central Park Ave., Suite 2000

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 8) and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 2) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by Friday, March 13, 2020. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved as amended by the Court and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. At the request of the parties, the pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, November 27, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by Wednesday, December 4, 2019. 5. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/21/19. (tfitz, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit Judge Lees opinion in Morales v. Travelers Property Casualty Company, et

#8

(#8) Joint Discovery Plan by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judge Lees opinion in Morales v. Travelers Property Casualty Company, et al., Case No. 05-552 (E.D. Va.))(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc..(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan G. Ostroff on behalf of Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc. (Ostroff, Ethan) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/12/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

2 #2

Pretrial Notice

2 #1

Mag.Consent

#2

(#2) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/06/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6924099.), filed by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reza, Syed) (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/6/2019) (acha, ). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 8) and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 2) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by Friday, March 13, 2020. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved as amended by the Court and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. At the request of the parties, the pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, November 27, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by Wednesday, December 4, 2019. 5. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for complete details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/21/19. (tfitz, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Joint Discovery Plan by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judge Lees opinion in Morales v. Travelers Property Casualty Company, et al., Case No. 05-552 (E.D. Va.))(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc..(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan G. Ostroff on behalf of Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc. (Ostroff, Ethan) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/12/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc.. (Reza, Syed) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/06/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (acha, ) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6924099.), filed by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency Parents' Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reza, Syed) (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/6/2019) (acha, ). (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA HIGHER EDUCATION ASSISTANCE AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ernest Paul Francis(Designation Retained)