This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 07:44:48 (UTC).

Anthony v. Juul Labs, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Anthony filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08486

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gloria Anthony

Defendants

JUUL Labs, Inc. previously d/b/a as PAX LABS, INC. and PLOOM INC.

Altria Group, Inc.

Phillip Morris USA, Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Enterprises LLC

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Hoyoung Huh

Riaz Valani

Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc.

Alternative Ingredients, Inc.

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

eLiquitech, Inc.

McLane Company, Inc.

Eby-Brown Company, LLC.

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

7-Eleven, Inc.

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alyson Oliver

Attorney at Oliver Law Group P.C.

1647 W. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48084

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to 7-Eleven, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC., Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., Phillip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, eLiquitech, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

1 #22

Summons

1 #20

Summons

1 #19

Summons

1 #18

Summons

1 #13

Summons

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:19-md-02913-WHO; Anthony v. Juul Labs, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-08486 WHO cc: JPMDL. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to 7-Eleven, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC., Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., Phillip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, eLiquitech, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons by Gloria Anthony. Amendment to #1 Complaint. (Oliver, Alyson) (Filed on 11/2/2021) Modified on 11/2/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Gloria Anthony. (Oliver, Alyson) (Filed on 11/2/2021) Modified on 11/2/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please indicate on the Civil Cover Sheet the MDL case number and Judge's name if this case is part of the MDL. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Gloria Anthony (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Gloria Anthony . (Oliver, Alyson) (Filed on 11/2/2021) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 version which can be downloaded from https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Gloria Anthony (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against 7-Eleven, Inc., Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC., Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., Phillip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, eLiquitech, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number ACANDC-16575716.). Filed by Gloria Anthony. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons) (Oliver, Alyson) (Filed on 11/1/2021) Modified on 11/2/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 7-Eleven Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where eLiquitech, Inc. is a litigant