This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 15:03:30 (UTC).

Anthony Bouyer v. Tripe S Proeprties et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 Anthony Bouyer filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Tripe S Proeprties. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and Stephen V. Wilson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00633

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,

Anthony Bouyer

Defendants

DOES 1-10 Inclusive

TRIPLE S PROEPRTIES, a California general partnership

Does 1-10, inclusive

Triple S Proeprties

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Richard Manning, Jr

Attorney at Manning Law APC

20062 Sw Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Triple S Proeprties. (ghap) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25165999 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

#9

(#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Anthony Bouyer amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#8

(#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer, upon Defendant Triple S Proeprties served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer, upon Defendant Triple S Proeprties served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Anthony Bouyer amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Triple S Proeprties. (ghap) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25165999 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.