This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2021 at 10:46:51 (UTC).

Anthony Bouyer v. Stonefire Grill 1, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 Anthony Bouyer filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Stonefire Grill 1, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11539

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Bouyer

Defendants

Does 1-10, inclusive

Cinema Park, LLC

Stonefire Grill 1, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Babak Hashemi

Attorney at Law Offices of Babak Hashemi

20062 Sw Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

Nathan Vern Okelberry

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Alexander Jacob Leal Kaplan

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Steven J Joffe

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2407

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court strikes the APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Cinema Park, LLC #15 , and the APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by defendants Stonefire Grill 1, Inc. #16 , without prejudice to refiling upon compliance with Local Rule 5-4.4.2 Submission of Word-Processing Versions of Proposed Orders. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Stonefire Grill 1, Inc., identifying Anthony Bouyer, Stonefire Grill 1, Inc., Stonefire Grill, Inc., Cinema Park, LLC. (Kaplan, Alexander) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Stonefire Grill 1, Inc. identifying Stonefire Grill, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Kaplan, Alexander) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER CIVIL MINUTES OF 2/19/2021, SEE DOCKET NO. 19] APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by defendants Stonefire Grill 1, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kaplan, Alexander) Modified on 2/19/2021 (gk). (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER CIVIL MINUTES OF 2/19/2021, SEE DOCKET NO. 19] APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Cinema Park, LLC. (Okelberry, Nathan) Modified on 2/19/2021 (gk). (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Stonefire Grill 1, Inc. answer now due 2/18/2021, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer.(Hashemi, Babak) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Cinema Park, LLC answer now due 2/18/2021, filed by Defendant Cinema Park, LLC.(Attorney Nathan Vern Okelberry added to party Cinema Park, LLC(pty:dft))(Okelberry, Nathan) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer, upon Defendant Stonefire Grill 1, Inc. served on 1/10/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer, upon Defendant Cinema Park, LLC served on 12/26/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cinema Park, LLC. (lh) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Stonefire Grill 1, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer. (Hashemi, Babak) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer. (Hashemi, Babak) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Anthony Bouyer, (Hashemi, Babak) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer. (Hashemi, Babak) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29653363 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer. (Attorney Babak Hashemi added to party Anthony Bouyer(pty:pla))(Hashemi, Babak) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cinema Park, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where STONEFIRE GRILL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan V. Okelberry(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven J. Joffee