This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/07/2020 at 08:19:48 (UTC).

Anthony Bouyer v. IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Anthony Bouyer filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09247

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Bouyer

Defendants

IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Richard Manning, Jr

Attorney at Manning Law APC

20062 Sw Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

Nathan Vern Okelberry

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 01:30 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC identifying Defendant as Corporate Parent. (Okelberry, Nathan) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC.(Attorney Nathan Vern Okelberry added to party IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC(pty:dft))(Okelberry, Nathan) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer, upon Defendant IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (esa) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28446824 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 01:30 AM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC identifying Defendant as Corporate Parent. (Okelberry, Nathan) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC.(Attorney Nathan Vern Okelberry added to party IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC(pty:dft))(Okelberry, Nathan) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Bouyer, upon Defendant IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant IVT Stevenson Ranch Plaza, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (esa) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28446824 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party ANTHONY BOUYER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Richard Manning, Jr