This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/26/2021 at 08:00:13 (UTC).

Anthony Adao Carter v. Sony Music Entertainment et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Anthony Adao Carter filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Sony Music Entertainment. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08490

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTHONY ADAO CARTER

Long Beach, CA 90815

Defendants

Sony Music Entertainment

HOUSE OF FUN MUSIC PUBLISHING

Capital Records

RCA Records

LOGIC RECORDS

Wild Pitch Records Ltd

Arista Records

BMG Rights Management

DOES 1-100, inclusive,

Wild Pitch Records

Does 1-100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Helane Alison Simon

Attorney at Law Office of Helane A. Simon

930 Palo Verde Avenue

Long Beach, CA 90815

Defendant Attorney

Peter J. Anderson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sony Music Entertainment answer now due 1/5/2022; Arista Records answer now due 1/5/2022; RCA Records answer now due 1/5/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #3 filed by defendants Sony Music Entertainment; Arista Records; RCA Records.(Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party Arista Records(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party RCA Records(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party Sony Music Entertainment(pty:dft))(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#10

(#10) PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #3 upon All Defendants, served by US MAIL service, by Federal statute, upon DESIGNATED AGENT. Remarks: NONE. (Simon, Helane) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#9

(#9) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon the filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 10/30/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Supplement notice of interested parties, No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet and No. 4 Supplement summons should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 3. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

7 #7

Summons as to Defendant BMG Rights Management

7 #6

Summons as to Defendant as to Arista Records

7 #5

Summons as to Defendant Wild Pitch Records

7 #4

Summons as to Defendant Logic Records

7 #3

Summons as to Defendant RCA Records

7 #2

Summons as to Defendant Capital Records

7 #1

Summons as to Defendant House of Fun Music

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

3 #4

Supplement summons'

3 #3

Exhibit

3 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Supplement notice of interested parties

3 #3

Main Document

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sony Music Entertainment answer now due 1/5/2022; Arista Records answer now due 1/5/2022; RCA Records answer now due 1/5/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #3 filed by defendants Sony Music Entertainment; Arista Records; RCA Records.(Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party Arista Records(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party RCA Records(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party Sony Music Entertainment(pty:dft))(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #3 upon All Defendants, served by US MAIL service, by Federal statute, upon DESIGNATED AGENT. Remarks: NONE. (Simon, Helane) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon the filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) (Entered: 10/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Supplement notice of interested parties, No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet and No. 4 Supplement summons should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 3. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #3 as to Defendants Arista Records, BMG Rights Management, Capital Records, House of Fun Music Publishing, Logic Records, RCA Records, Sony Music Entertainment, Wild Pitch Records. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant House of Fun Music, #2 Summons as to Defendant Capital Records, #3 Summons as to Defendant RCA Records, #4 Summons as to Defendant Logic Records, #5 Summons as to Defendant Wild Pitch Records, #6 Summons as to Defendant as to Arista Records, #7 Summons as to Defendant BMG Rights Management) (lh) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 10/27/21, receipt number Tracking Id: ACACDC-32224171), filed by attorney ANTHONY ADAO CARTER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement notice of interested parties, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Supplement summons')(Simon, Helane) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. (lh) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SUMMONS with filing fee previously paid (402.00 paid on 10/27/2021, receipt number : ACACDC-32224171), filed by attorney ANTHONY ADAO CARTER. (Attorney Helane Alison Simon added to party ANTHONY ADAO CARTER(pty:pla))(Simon, Helane) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-32224171 for $402 filing fee. (Simon, Helane) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where House of Fun Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITOL RECORDS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony Music Entertainment Italy S.p.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where BMG Rights Management (UK) Limited is a litigant