This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2021 at 10:34:43 (UTC).

Anspaugh v. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Anspaugh filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen J. Murphy, III and Jonathan J.C. Grey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-12260

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen J. Murphy, III

Referral Judge

Jonathan J.C. Grey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Anspaugh

Defendant

Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Noah S. Hurwitz

Attorney at NachtLaw, P.C.

101 N. Main Streetsuite 555

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Defendant Attorneys

Angelina Rose Delmastro

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC

500 Woodward Ave.

Detroit, MI 48226

Timothy H. Howlett

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

500 Woodward Avenuesuite 4000

Detroit, MI 48226-3425

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. served on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Hurwitz, Noah) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.. (Howlett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference via ZOOM, (Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#6

(#6) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hurwitz, Noah) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#7

(#7) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Howlett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2022, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/1/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2023 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III, Jury Trial set for 4/25/2023 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DPar) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Angelina Rose Delmastro appearing on behalf of Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Delmastro, Angelina) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Angelina Rose Delmastro appearing on behalf of Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Delmastro, Angelina) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2022, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/1/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2023 02:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III, Jury Trial set for 4/25/2023 09:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (Refer to image for additional dates) (DPar) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 11/3/2021. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (DPar) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. (Howlett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Hurwitz, Noah) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference via ZOOM, (Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2021 10:30 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.. (Howlett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. served on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Hurwitz, Noah) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.* (SKra) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Susan Anspaugh against Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8629489 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Hurwitz, Noah) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angelina Rose Delmastro

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy H. Howlett