Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 07:48:42 (UTC).

Another Level Tower Services, Inc. v. Overland Contracting Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Another Level Tower Services, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Overland Contracting Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gwynne E. Birzer and Julie A. Robinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02764

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gwynne E. Birzer

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Another Level Tower Services, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Overland Contracting Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Christopher L. Kurtz

Attorney at Rouse Frets White Goss Gentile Rhodes, P.C.

5250 W. 116Th Place, Suite 400

Leawood, KS 66211

Anthony J. Bruozas

Attorney at Anthony J. Bruozas & Associates, PC

1250 North Convent Street, Unit B

Bourbonnais, IL 60914

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Sharon Kennedy

Attorney at James Sobba, LLC

4435 Main Street, Suite 910

Kansas City, MO 64111

G. Edgar James

Attorney at James Sobba, LLC

4435 Main Street, Suite 910

Kansas City, MO 64111

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Another Level Tower Services, Inc..(Kurtz, Christopher) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#11

(#11) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 2/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/8/20. (ala) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Another Level Tower Services, Inc. by Overland Contracting Inc..(James, G.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) DOCKET ANNOTATION re #6 : Document attached with the corrected title caption. This entry is for notification purposes only. (ca) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Another Level Tower Services, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Kurtz, Christopher) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

6 #2

ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Registration Form

6 #1

Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice

#6

(#6) MOTION for attorney Anthony J. Bruozas to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5019740.) by Plaintiff Another Level Tower Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Registration Form)(Kurtz, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2020: #3 Corrected Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (ca). Modified on 1/7/2020 to attach corrected document(ca). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#5

(#5) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 01/07/2020 for Defendant Overland Contracting Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/23/2019. (ca) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Overland Contracting Inc. identifying Black & Veatch Corporation as corporate parent . (James, G.) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal by Overland Contracting Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(James, G.) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Overland Contracting Inc.. (James, G.) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County Kansas, case number 19LA12511 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5009495.), filed by Overland Contracting Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(James, G.) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Another Level Tower Services, Inc..(Kurtz, Christopher) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 2/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/8/20. (ala) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Another Level Tower Services, Inc. by Overland Contracting Inc..(James, G.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony J. Bruozas for Another Level Tower Services, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/7/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKET ANNOTATION re #6 : Document attached with the corrected title caption. This entry is for notification purposes only. (ca) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Another Level Tower Services, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Kurtz, Christopher) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for attorney Anthony J. Bruozas to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5019740.) by Plaintiff Another Level Tower Services, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form Pro Hac Vice Electronic Registration Form)(Kurtz, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2020: #3 Corrected Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (ca). Modified on 1/7/2020 to attach corrected document(ca). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 01/07/2020 for Defendant Overland Contracting Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/23/2019. (ca) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Overland Contracting Inc. identifying Black & Veatch Corporation as corporate parent . (James, G.) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal by Overland Contracting Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(James, G.) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Overland Contracting Inc.. (James, G.) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County Kansas, case number 19LA12511 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5009495.), filed by Overland Contracting Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(James, G.) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Overland Contracting, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony J. Bruozas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher L. Kurtz