This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2023 at 19:34:40 (UTC).

Annor et al v. Lily Transportation Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 Annor filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lily Transportation Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01908

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Deborah Annor

S. A., an Infant by the Mother and Natural Guardian, Janet Annor

J. A., an Infant by the Mother and Natural Guardian, Janet Annor

Janet Annor

Defendants

Lily Transportation Corp.

Charlton Krause

Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.

Ironclad Logistics, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert J. Passarelli

Adam D Polo

Defendant Attorney

Keith Alan Raven

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #29 Letter filed by Ironclad Logistics, LLC, Charlton Krause, Lily Transportation Corp., #30 Letter filed by Ironclad Logistics, LLC, Charlton Krause, Lily Transportation Corp. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall provide a joint status update on settlement, including the anticipated motion to approve the compromise orders pursuant to CPLR 1207, by no later than March 10, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/9/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

#30

(#30) JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Keith A. Raven dated February 7, 2023 re: Settlement. Document filed by Ironclad Logistics, LLC, Charlton Krause, Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#29

(#29) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Keith A. Raven dated February 7, 2023 re: Settlement. Document filed by Ironclad Logistics, LLC, Charlton Krause, Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#28

(#28) ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: By Order of Reference dated January 20, 2023 (Dkt. No. 22), Judge Caproni referred this case to me for settlement. The parties and the Court conferred, and agreed that the conference will be held before me on March 28, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Unless circumstances permit otherwise, the conference will be held on Zoom. The Court will begin the settlement conference in joint session with all parties before breaking into private session and speaking to the parties individually using Zoom's breakout room feature. The Court will email a Zoom link to counsel a few days before the settlement conference. The Court's "Standing Order for All Cases Referred for Settlement to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott" is enclosed and is incorporated herein by reference. Please read the Standing Order carefully. Failure to comply with the Standing Order may result in sanctions. The parties are directed to pay particular attention to paragraph 5, which sets forth who must appear at the conference on behalf of a corporate party. The parties should also note that paragraph 3 of the Standing Order requires ex parte written submissions to be made five (5) business days prior to the conference, in this case March 21, 2023. Paragraph 4 requires that a copy of the Acknowledgment Form be submitted to opposing parties and another copy be submitted to the Court together with the ex parte settlement letter. Each party must include the name, telephone number, and email address of each participant on the Acknowledgement Form. Pursuant to the instructions in the Standing Order, the parties should email these materials to CottNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. Finally, Paragraph 3 of the Standing Order requires that if plaintiffs have not already made a demand, they must do so no later than 14 days prior to the conference, and defendants shall respond no later than 7 days thereafter. Even if plaintiffs have made a demand as part of a court-ordered or private mediation previously attended by the parties, plaintiffs are still required to make (or renew) a demand 14 days prior to the conference, and defendants must respond within 7 days. In other words, the parties should not wait for the settlement conference in order to commence negotiations of a resolution of their dispute. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 3/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 2/2/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#26

(#26) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Adam D. Polo, Esq. dated 2/1/2023. Document filed by Deborah Annor. Return Date set for 3/28/2023 at 10:00 AM..(Polo, Adam) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#25

(#25) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #24 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Deborah Annor. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will not issue sanctions at this time. Counsel is reminded to carefully read the docket in this case and review it regularly. Counsel is further warned not to rely solely on emails from ECF, as technical glitches can and do occur. Failure to appear in any future hearing or conference in this case may result in sanctions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/30/2023) (tg) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

#24

(#24) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #21 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Deborah Annor..(Passarelli, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

(#24) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #21 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Deborah Annor..(Passarelli, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #29 Letter filed by Ironclad Logistics, LLC, Charlton Krause, Lily Transportation Corp., #30 Letter filed by Ironclad Logistics, LLC, Charlton Krause, Lily Transportation Corp. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall provide a joint status update on settlement, including the anticipated motion to approve the compromise orders pursuant to CPLR 1207, by no later than March 10, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/9/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

Docket(#31) ORDER. In light of the reported settlement, the March 28 settlement conference is adjourned sine die. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott) (Text Only Order) (Cott, James) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Keith A. Raven dated February 7, 2023 re: Settlement. Document filed by Ironclad Logistics, LLC, Charlton Krause, Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#29) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Keith A. Raven dated February 7, 2023 re: Settlement. Document filed by Ironclad Logistics, LLC, Charlton Krause, Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: By Order of Reference dated January 20, 2023 (Dkt. No. 22), Judge Caproni referred this case to me for settlement. The parties and the Court conferred, and agreed that the conference will be held before me on March 28, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Unless circumstances permit otherwise, the conference will be held on Zoom. The Court will begin the settlement conference in joint session with all parties before breaking into private session and speaking to the parties individually using Zoom's breakout room feature. The Court will email a Zoom link to counsel a few days before the settlement conference. The Court's "Standing Order for All Cases Referred for Settlement to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott" is enclosed and is incorporated herein by reference. Please read the Standing Order carefully. Failure to comply with the Standing Order may result in sanctions. The parties are directed to pay particular attention to paragraph 5, which sets forth who must appear at the conference on behalf of a corporate party. The parties should also note that paragraph 3 of the Standing Order requires ex parte written submissions to be made five (5) business days prior to the conference, in this case March 21, 2023. Paragraph 4 requires that a copy of the Acknowledgment Form be submitted to opposing parties and another copy be submitted to the Court together with the ex parte settlement letter. Each party must include the name, telephone number, and email address of each participant on the Acknowledgement Form. Pursuant to the instructions in the Standing Order, the parties should email these materials to CottNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. Finally, Paragraph 3 of the Standing Order requires that if plaintiffs have not already made a demand, they must do so no later than 14 days prior to the conference, and defendants shall respond no later than 7 days thereafter. Even if plaintiffs have made a demand as part of a court-ordered or private mediation previously attended by the parties, plaintiffs are still required to make (or renew) a demand 14 days prior to the conference, and defendants must respond within 7 days. In other words, the parties should not wait for the settlement conference in order to commence negotiations of a resolution of their dispute. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 3/28/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 2/2/2023) (tg) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) ORDER granting #26 Letter Motion for Conference re: #26 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Adam D. Polo, Esq. dated 2/1/2023. Application granted. The settlement conference in this case will take place remotely on March 28, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Ex parte settlement letters will be due by March 21, 2023. Additional information about the settlement conference will be provided in a separate order, to be docketed shortly. To be clear, the settlement conference is before me - not Judge Caproni - to whom this letter-motion was apparently mistakenly addressed. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Adam D. Polo, Esq. dated 2/1/2023. Document filed by Deborah Annor. Return Date set for 3/28/2023 at 10:00 AM..(Polo, Adam) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #24 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Deborah Annor. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will not issue sanctions at this time. Counsel is reminded to carefully read the docket in this case and review it regularly. Counsel is further warned not to rely solely on emails from ECF, as technical glitches can and do occur. Failure to appear in any future hearing or conference in this case may result in sanctions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/30/2023) (tg) (Entered: 01/30/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #21 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Deborah Annor..(Passarelli, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023

DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 1/20/2023. Attorneys Adam Polo and Robert Passarelli present for the plaintiffs. Attorney Keith Raven present for the defendants. Court Reporter Andrew Walker present. (anc) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
03/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 812807/2021E..Document filed by Charlton Krause, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Ironclad Logistics, LLC, Lily Transportation Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint and Supplemental Summons and Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Verified Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Demands for Damages, #4 Exhibit D - Letter).(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022

DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022

DocketMagistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2022
View Court Documents

Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Keith Alan Raven to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Rule 13.3, you must refile your pleading with exhibits named accordingly. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Lily Transportation Corp. for Ironclad Logistics, LLC. Document filed by Ironclad Logistics, LLC..(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ryder Truck Rental, Inc...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Raven, Keith) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING -ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 812807/2021E. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25821235).Document filed by Charlton Krause, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Ironclad Logistics, LLC, Lily Transportation Corp...(Raven, Keith) Modified on 3/8/2022 (vf). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less