This case was last updated from PACER on 01/07/2020 at 05:22:22 (UTC).

Anna Marie Bruggeman et al v. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Anna Marie Bruggeman filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Frederick F. Mumm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10873

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Jim Thomas Bruggeman

Anna Marie Bruggeman

Respondent

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Christopher Michael Lovasz

Attorney at Consumer Legal Services PC

2330 Long Beach Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90806

Respondent Attorneys

Hailey Rogerson

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

3 Park Center Drive Suite 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

Spencer Peter Hugret

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (ghap) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 36 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 12/26/2019 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:19-cv-2478-MCE-KJN from Eastern District of California (Sacramento). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2814. (ghap) Modified on 1/6/2020 (ghap). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern (Entered: 01/06/2020)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California.ELECTRONIC RECORDS sent. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/11/2019)

5 #2

VDRP

5 #1

Consent Form

4 #1

Proof of Service

#4

(#4) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Hailey Rogerson on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Rogerson, Hailey added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of RELATED CASE by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/11/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #3

Proof of Service

2 #1

Proof of Service

#2

(#2) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/11/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (ghap) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 36 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 12/26/2019 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:19-cv-2478-MCE-KJN from Eastern District of California (Sacramento). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2814. (ghap) Modified on 1/6/2020 (ghap). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California.ELECTRONIC RECORDS sent. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Hailey Rogerson on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Rogerson, Hailey added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of RELATED CASE by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Butte County Superior Court, case number 19CV03361 by Ford Motor Company. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8615455) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Spencer P. Hugret, #2 Declaration Of Hailey M. Rogerson, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Certification Of Interested Entities, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) [Transferred from California Eastern on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.