This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 09:05:31 (UTC).

Anita G. Zucker, Trustee of the Anita G. Zucker Trust et al v. Bowl America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On August 4, 2021, Anita G. Zucker, Trustee of the Anita G. Zucker Trust and Anita G. Zucker Trustee of the Article 6 Marital Trust, (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Daniel Stephen Sommers of Cohen Milstein Sellers and Toll PLLC, filed a class action against Bowl America, Inc. (“Bowl America” or the “Company”), Bowlero Corp., Duff & Phelps Securities LLC, Cheryl Dragoo, Allan Sher, & others, (collectively, the “Defendants”), seeking declaratory relief, among other reliefs, for allegedly issuing a materially false and misleading Proxy Statement in connection with the proposed merger. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of Maryland with Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher presiding. 

In the complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged that, “This shareholder class action challenges an unfair, misleading, and grossly inadequate merger between Bowl America and Bowlero that was orchestrated by a reckless and self-interested Board of Directors who were intent on forcing the sale of a proven, debt-free, and valuable company at a fire sale price. Instead of leading Bowl America into the future following a temporary shutdown that was caused by the COVID-19 pandemic, the Board of Directors elected to quit; betraying their shareholders, and seeking to liquidate their personal holdings at the earliest opportunity through a forced sale of the Company at a discount to its market price and far below its intrinsic value, while simultaneously issuing a materially false and misleading Proxy Statement on Schedule 14A dated July 13, 2021 (the “Merger Proxy”) -- and breaching their fiduciary duties in the process.” 

The Plaintiffs further alleged that “Certain of the Director Defendants have complete control over the Company and control a majority of the votes on the merger largely by virtue of their holdings of Class B stock which entitles them to ten (10) votes per share, while Plaintiffs and similarly situated class members hold shares of Class A stock entitling them to just one (1) vote per share. The merger is the result of a self-dealing transaction entered into by certain controlling stockholders, Defendants Macklin, Hull and Fabian. The merger price of $44 million dollars is grossly unfair to stockholders as just the unencumbered real estate owned by Bowl America has a value in excess of $50 million dollars. Both D&P, the Company’s financial advisor, and Bowlero, the acquirer, provided substantial assistance to and aided and abetted the Director Defendants’ breaches of fiduciary duties in connection with the merger.”

The Plaintiffs have laid down six claims for relief. The first claim is against Bowl America and Director Defendants for alleged violation of Section 14(a) and Rule 14a-9 of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934. The second, third and fourth claims are against Director Defendants for alleged violation of Section 20(a) of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934, breach of fiduciary duties, and breach of Md. Code Ann, Corp. & Ass’ns § 2-405.1(a), respectively. The fifth and sixth claim is against Bowlero and D&P, respectively, for aiding and abetting Director Defendants’ breaches of fiduciary duty. 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs requested the Court to declare the Merger Proxy materially false and misleading in alleged violation of the securities laws, find that the Director Defendants violated Securities and Exchange Act, breached their fiduciary duties and D&P and Bowlero aided and abetted the said breach, award the Plaintiffs and the Class, damages and their reasonable attorneys’ fees, expenses, expert fees and costs.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01967

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie A. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anita G. Zucker, Trustee of the Anita G. Zucker Trust Dated April 4, 2007, as Subsequently Amended or Restated

Anita G. Zucker as Trustee of the Article 6 Marital Trust, Under the First Amended and Restated Jerry Zucker Revocable Trust Dated April 2, 2007

Defendants

Bowl America, Inc.

Bowlero Corp.

Duff & Phelps Securities LLC

Cheryl A. Dragoo

Allan L. Sher

Merle Fabian

Gloria M. Bragg

Nancy E. Hull

Ruth Macklin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Stephen Sommers

Attorney at Cohen Milstein Sellers and Toll PLLC

1100 New York Ave Nw Ste 500 East

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#5

#4

3 #1

Attachment Redlined Complaint

#3

#2

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MARGINAL ORDER APPROVING #4 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS AND DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT, filed by Anita G. Zucker, Trustee of the Anita G. Zucker Trust Dated April 4, 2007, as Subsequently Amended or Restated, Anita G. Zucker as Trustee of the Article 6 Marital Trust, Under the First Amended and Restated Jerry Zucker Revocable Trust Dated April 2, 2007. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 9/16/2021. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS AND DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Anita G. Zucker as Trustee of the Article 6 Marital Trust, Under the First Amended and Restated Jerry Zucker Revocable Trust Dated April 2, 2007, Anita G. Zucker, Trustee of the Anita G. Zucker Trust Dated April 4, 2007, as Subsequently Amended or Restated(Sommers, Daniel) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Anita G. Zucker, Trustee of the Article 6 Marital Trust, Under the First Amended and Restated Jerry Zucker Revocable Trust, Anita G. Zucker, Trustee of the Anita G. Zucker Trust. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redlined Complaint)(Sommers, Daniel) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Bowl America, Inc., Bowlero Corp., Gloria M. Bragg, Cheryl A. Dragoo, Duff & Phelps Securities LLC, Merle Fabian, Nancy E. Hull, Ruth Macklin, Allan L. Sher.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketJury Trial Demand by Anita G. Zucker, Trustee of the Anita G. Zucker Trust, Anita G. Zucker, Trustee of the Article 6 Marital Trust, Under the First Amended and Restated Jerry Zucker Revocable Trust(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9417725.), filed by Anita G. Zucker, Trustee of the Article 6 Marital Trust, Under the First Amended and Restated Jerry Zucker Revocable Trust, Anita G. Zucker, Trustee of the Anita G. Zucker Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Sommers, Daniel) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less