This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 09:07:23 (UTC).

Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Reynolds et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 Animal Legal Defense Fund filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Reynolds. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and James E. Gritzner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00124

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judge

James E. Gritzner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement

Animal Legal Defense Fund

Bailing Out Benji

People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.

Center for Food Safety

Defendants

Kimberly Reynolds

Drew B. Swanson

Thomas Miller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cristina Rachel Stella

Attorney at ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND

525 East Cotati Avenue

Cotati, CA 94931

Matthew Strugar

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MATTHEW STRUGAR

3435 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 2910

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Rita N. Bettis Austen

Attorney at ACLU OF IOWA FOUNDATION

505 Fifth Avenue, Suite 808

Des Moines, IA 50309

Kelsey Rinehart Eberly

Attorney at ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND

525 East Cotati Avenue

Cotati, CA 94931

David Samuel Muraskin

Attorney at PUBLIC JUSTICE, P.C.

1620 L Street Nw, Suite 630

Washington, DC 20036

Matthew Glen Liebman

Attorney at ANIMAL LEGAL DEFENSE FUND

525 East Cotati Avenue

Cotati, CA 94931

Alan K. Chen

Attorney at UNIVERSITY OF DENVER STURM COLLEGE OF LAW

2255 East Evans Avenue

Denver, CO 80208

Justin F. Marceau

Attorney at UNIVERSITY OF DENVER STURM COLLEGE OF LAW

2255 East Evans Avenue

Denver, CO 80208

Defendant Attorney

Jacob John Larson

Attorney at IOWA ATTORNEY GENERAL -- Des Moines

1305 E Walnut Street

Des Moines, IA 50319

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

19 #1

Brief in Support Motion to Dismiss

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#13

#12

#10

#8

#6

#4

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs shall file their resistance by July 19, 2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/25/2019. (imk) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) BRIEF by Thomas Miller, Kimberly Reynolds, Drew B. Swanson re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (slg) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Resistance to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to file overlength brief. Defendants may file their overlength brief. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/21/2019. (imk) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to file overlength brief by Thomas Miller, Kimberly Reynolds, Drew B. Swanson.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Motion to Dismiss)(Larson, Jacob) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Thomas Miller, Kimberly Reynolds, Drew B. Swanson. Responses due by 7/5/2019. (Larson, Jacob) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc., Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Food Safety, Bailing Out Benji, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement; Drew B. Swanson waiver served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Bettis Austen, Rita) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc., Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Food Safety, Bailing Out Benji, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement; Thomas Miller waiver served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019; Kimberly Reynolds waiver served on 4/22/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. (Bettis Austen, Rita) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew Liebman; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Cristina Stella. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 5/1/2019. (kjw) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Justin Marceau. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/23/2019. (slg) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3801696 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Marceau, Justin) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alan Chen. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/23/2019. (slg) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3801599 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Chen, Alan) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kelsey Eberly; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David Muraskin. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 4/23/2019. (slg) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3801332 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Muraskin, David) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (slg) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3801145 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Animal Legal Defense Fund, Bailing Out Benji, Center for Food Safety, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement, People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Eberly, Kelsey) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketSenior Judge James E. Gritzner and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. Magistrate Judge Celeste F. Bremer and Senior Judge Charles R. Wolle no longer assigned to case. (kjw) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3799795., filed by People For The Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc., Animal Legal Defense Fund, Center for Food Safety, Bailing Out Benji, Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/22/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/22/2019.(Bettis Austen, Rita) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IOWA CITIZENS FOR COMMUNITY IMPROVEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Animal Legal Defense Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant