This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2022 at 11:45:20 (UTC).

ANIBRA v. AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 ANIBRA filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon, Matthew P. Brookman and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00728

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judges

Matthew P. Brookman

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAC-MARIAN ANIBRA

Defendant

AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jay Meisenhelder

Attorney at JAY MEISENHELDER EMPLOYMENT & CIVIL RIGHTS LEGAL SERVICES PC

650 North Girls School Road, Suite D40

Indianapolis, IN 46214

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Carl Mohler

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Theresa Renee Parish

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Meisenhelder on behalf of Plaintiff MAC-MARIAN ANIBRA. (Meisenhelder, Jay) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP. (DJH) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - In the interest of speedy administration of justice, to ensure appropriate oversight, and pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(f), the Clerk IS HEREBY ORDERED to reassign this matter to Magistrate Judge Baker. The parties should use the above cause number in all future filings in this matter. All case schedules and deadlines before the District Judge and Magistrate Judge remain unchanged at this time, including hearing, conference, and trial dates. In the event that any calendared dates must be vacated and reassigned, the parties will receive notice by separate order. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/13/2022.(AKH) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-cv-728-JPH-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#7

(#7) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (MAC) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Renee Parish on behalf of Defendant AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carl Mohler on behalf of Defendant AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.. (Mohler, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2022 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/9/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#13

(#13) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP..(Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#14

(#14) Joint Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff MAC-MARIAN ANIBRA . (Meisenhelder, Jay) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff MAC-MARIAN ANIBRA . (Meisenhelder, Jay) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP..(Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2022 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall participate in this conference by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/9/2022.(SWM) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Carl Mohler on behalf of Defendant AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.. (Mohler, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Renee Parish on behalf of Defendant AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP.. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (MAC) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:22-cv-728-JPH-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - In the interest of speedy administration of justice, to ensure appropriate oversight, and pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(f), the Clerk IS HEREBY ORDERED to reassign this matter to Magistrate Judge Baker. The parties should use the above cause number in all future filings in this matter. All case schedules and deadlines before the District Judge and Magistrate Judge remain unchanged at this time, including hearing, conference, and trial dates. In the event that any calendared dates must be vacated and reassigned, the parties will receive notice by separate order. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 4/13/2022.(AKH) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP. (DJH) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Meisenhelder on behalf of Plaintiff MAC-MARIAN ANIBRA. (Meisenhelder, Jay) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORP., filed by MAC-MARIAN ANIBRA. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7054421) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Meisenhelder, Jay) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theresa Renee Parish

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C Mohler