This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2022 at 08:44:01 (UTC).

Anglin v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Anglin filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Larry Alan Burns and Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02110

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Larry Alan Burns

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Connie Anglin

Defendants

Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.

Does 1 through 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jorge Rojas

Attorney at Khatib & Rojas

790 E. Colorado Blvd. 9Th Floor

Pasadena, CA 91101

Mazen Khatib

Attorney at Khatib Law, APC

3200 Guasti Road, Suite 100

Ontario, CA 91761

Defendant Attorney

Juan Carlos Araneda

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2050

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Declaration of Juan C. Araneda in Support of Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (axc) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/21/2021.(dxf) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Anglin Connie for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc... (Araneda, Juan) (dxf). (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mazen Khatib on behalf of Connie Anglin (Khatib, Mazen)Attorney Mazen Khatib added to party Connie Anglin(pty:pla) (jms). (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#6

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/10/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2023 12:00 PM before Judge Larry Alan Burns.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/10/2022.(jms) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Mazen Khatib (Khatib, Mazen) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Mazen Khatib (Khatib, Mazen) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/10/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2023 12:00 PM before Judge Larry Alan Burns.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 2/10/2022.(jms) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docket(#7) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford:An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference were held on 2/9/2022. The case did not settle. A Scheduling Order will issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Mazen Khatib).(Defendant Attorney Juan Areneda). (no document attached) (src) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. (Araneda, Juan) (jms). (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Mazen Khatib on behalf of Connie Anglin (Khatib, Mazen)Attorney Mazen Khatib added to party Connie Anglin(pty:pla) (jms). (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Anglin Connie for Wal-Mart Associates, Inc... (Araneda, Juan) (dxf). (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/21/2021.(dxf) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (axc) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16421012.), filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Juan C. Araneda in Support of Notice of Removal)The new case number is 3:21-cv-2110-LAB-KSC. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(axc) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juan Araneda