This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2021 at 08:57:07 (UTC).

Anglin et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 Anglin filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William P. Dimitrouleas and Lurana S. Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61592

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William P. Dimitrouleas

Referral Judge

Lurana S. Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DIANNE ANGLIN

CARMEN ANGLIN

Defendants

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Philip McDonald

Attorney at McDonald & Barnhill, P.A.

12000 N. Dale Mabry Highway, Suite 270

Tampa, FL 33618

David Duff Barnhill

Attorney at McDonald & Barnhill, P.A.

12000 N. Dale Mabry Highway, Suite 270

Tampa, FL 33618

Defendant Attorney

Richard Edward Zelonka, Jr.

Attorney at Wood Smith Henning & Berman, LLP

1230 Peachtree Street, Suite 925

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Docket Sheet

#3

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit A

4 #2

Exhibit B

#5

#6

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order proposed Scheduling Order

#8

#9

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/19/2021. (jz) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 10/11/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 10/7/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by CARMEN ANGLIN, DIANNE ANGLIN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Scheduling Order)(McDonald, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Wayne Miller as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 10/21/2021 at 1:00 pm EST. (McDonald, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #3 Order to Show Cause by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Zelonka, Richard) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/11/2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Breach of Contract and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14895539, filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON. No Motion to Dismiss has been attached, Answers have been attached.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Docket Sheet)(Zelonka, Richard) (ebz). (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard E. Zelonka, Jr