This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:28:05 (UTC).

Denise Angiano et al v. Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Denise Angiano filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr, Rozella A. Oliver, Pedro V. Castillo and Percy Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01879

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Andre Birotte Jr

Percy Anderson

Referral Judges

Rozella A. Oliver

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Denise Angiano

Charley Karpinski

Defendants

Does 1 to 100 inclusive

Anheuser-Busch, LLC

Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc.

Does 1 to 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cinela Aziz

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm PLC

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Thiago Merlini Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Robert James Dart

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

David H. Stern

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Alex Edwin Spjute

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

James F. Bennett

Attorney at Dowd Bennett LLP

7733 Forsyth Boulevard Suite 1900

St. Louis, MO 63105

James R. Jackson

Attorney at Dowd Bennett LLP

7733 Forsyth Boulevard Suite 1900

St. Louis, MO 93105

 

Court Documents

#23

#21

#20

#18

#16

#15

#14

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 21-55460 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #22 as to plaintiffs Denise Angiano, Charley Karpinski. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Denise Angiano, Charley Karpinski. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,, #20 , Judgment, #21 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31222140.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket 21, #2 Exhibit Docket 20)(Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson, in favor of defendants Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc., Anheuser-Busch, LLC against plaintiffs Charley Karpinski, Denise Angiano Related to: Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, #20 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiffs take nothing and that Defendants shall have their costs of suit pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case. For all of the foregoing reasons, the Court grants Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses Plaintiffs' MMWA claim without prejudice to Plaintiff bringing this claim in the appropriate venue. As to the remainder of Plaintiffs' claims, the Court finds that leave to amend would be futile, and dismisses these claims with prejudice. Del Toro v. Centene Corporation, 19-cv-05163, 2020 WL 6081738, at *5 (N.D. Cal. Oct. 14, 2020) ("Dismissing with prejudice is warranted when allowing leave to amend would be futile.") The Court will issue a judgment consistent with this Order. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) IN CHAMBERS ORDER TAKING MOTION UNDER ADVISEMENT by Judge Percy Anderson. A hearing on the MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 is scheduled for April 5, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for April 5, 2021, is vacated and the matter taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney James R. Jackson APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendants Anheuser-Busch Inbev Worldwide Inc and Anheuser-Busch LLC, designating David H. Stern as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James R. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc., Anheuser-Busch, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31021749) filed by Defendants Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc., Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stern, David) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The current Notice of Removal appears to suffer from procedural defects. In particular, the current Notice of Removal appears to be based on the same grounds as defendant Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide Inc.'s January 15, 2021 Notice of Removal in Case No. 21-cv-00435 (PA) (PVCx). As a result, the current Notice of Removal may violate the rule against successive removals. In light of this potential defect, the Court notifies the parties that they should be prepared to address the Notice of Removal's procedural defects at the April 5, 2021 hearing on Defendants' motion to dismiss. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc., Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Spjute, Alex) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #7 filed by Plaintiff Denise Angiano. (Coelho, Thiago) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 21-01 (identical case) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. Case number now reads as 2:21-cv-01879 PA(PVCx). (rn) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James F. Bennett. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc., Anheuser-Busch, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A to E to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint) (Stern, David) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc., Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Denise Angiano, Charley Karpinski. FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/24/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc., Anheuser-Busch, LLC, identifying Denise Angiano (Plaintiff); Charley Karpinski (Plaintiff); Anheuser-Busch, LLC (Defendant and a Wholly Owned Subsidiary of Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC); Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC (Wholly Owned Subsidiary of Defendant A-B InBev); Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc. (Defendant); Anheuser-Busch InBev SA/NV (Indirect Parent of Defendant). (Stern, David) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc., Anheuser-Busch, LLC. Related Case(s): CV 21-00435 PA (PVCx) (Stern, David) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc., Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Stern, David) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court - Central District, case number 20STCV45069 Receipt No: ACACDC-30758641 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Anheuser-Busch, LLC, Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Minute Order Remanding Case, #4 Exhibit 4 - First Thomas Larson Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons, #6 Exhibit 6 - Original Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Case Assignment, #8 Exhibit 8 - Court Order Re: Newly Assigned Case, #9 Exhibit 9 - State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #10 Declaration of Jeffrey Perkowski in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal, #11 Declaration of Thomas Larson in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal) (Attorney David H. Stern added to party Anheuser-Busch InBev Worldwide, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David H. Stern added to party Anheuser-Busch, LLC(pty:dft))(Stern, David) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANHEUSER BUSCH COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James R. Jackson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Edwin Spjute

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David H. Stern