This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2020 at 09:46:32 (UTC).

Angelo v. Hearth Management LLC

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Angelo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Hearth Management LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael P. Shea. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01640

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael P. Shea

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bruce Angelo

Defendants

Hearth Management, LLC

Hearth Management LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael John Reilly

Attorney at Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP

364 Franklin Avenue

Hartford, CT 06114

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah R. Skubas

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, CT

90 State House Sq., 8Th Fl.

Hartford, CT 06103-3708

Sarah Tischbein Bold

Attorney at Hassett & Donnelly, P.C.

100 Pearl Street, 11Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice by Hearth Management LLC. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Tischbein Bold on behalf of Hearth Management LLC (Bold, Sarah) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time until December 24, 2020 In Which to Respond to Complaint by Hearth Management LLC. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of Hearth Management LLC (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hearth Management LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice, #1 Complaint filed by Bruce Angelo Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2020. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

5 #1

Initial Discovery Protocols Attachment

#5

(#5) Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols Attachment) (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/29/2020. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/29/2020. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/28/2020. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2020. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hearth Management, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6191063.), filed by Bruce Angelo.(Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketJUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#13) ORDER. The parties' have filed a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (ECF No. 12). All parties who have appeared have signed the stipulation. As a result, this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and the Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/16/2020. (Super, John) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice by Hearth Management LLC. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated for Hearth Management LLC to 12/24/2020. (Johnson, D.) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER. The #9 motion for extension is hereby GRANTED. The defendant shall file its response to the complaint no later than December 24, 2020. The Court is unlikely to further extend this deadline.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/25/2020. (Super, John) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Tischbein Bold on behalf of Hearth Management LLC (Bold, Sarah) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time until December 24, 2020 In Which to Respond to Complaint by Hearth Management LLC. (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of Hearth Management LLC (Skubas, Sarah) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hearth Management LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice, #1 Complaint filed by Bruce Angelo Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2020. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols Attachment) (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/29/2020. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/29/2020. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/28/2020. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2021. Signed by Clerk on 10/29/2020. (Peterson, M) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketJudge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Hearth Management, LLC. (Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hearth Management, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6191063.), filed by Bruce Angelo.(Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Health Management Associates Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah R. Skubas