This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2022 at 05:32:12 (UTC).

Angelica Garcia et al v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2022 Angelica Garcia filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against CVS Pharmacy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10029

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Angelica Garcia

J. M. G.

Defendants

CVS Pharmacy Inc

The Kroger, Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerald Blaine Singleton

Attorney at Singleton Schreiber LLP

2945 Townsgate Road Suite 200

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Defendant Attorneys

Kristen Lee Richer

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Ste 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Sarah E. Johnston

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joseph A. Lara

Attorney at Stone Dean LLP

21052 Oxnard Street

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Gregory E Stone

Attorney at Stone Dean LLP

21052 Oxnard Street

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

30 #1

*Restricted*

30 #30

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#29

(#29) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3043, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Denise L. Cote. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#28

(#28) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs J. M. G., Angelica Garciato Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 26 (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#27

(#27) ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT THE KROGER COMPANY TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (Doc. #25 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton that THE KROGER CO.'s time to file a responsive pleading shall be extended by thirty (30) days from 10/28/2022. THE KROGER CO.'s responsive pleading shall be due on or before 11/27/2022, unless otherwise ordered by the district judge to whom this action is transferred. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/15/2022)

25 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

25 #25

Main Document

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

18 #1

Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03043-DLC. (vba) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03043-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 8:22-cv-01596. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3043, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Denise L. Cote. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs J. M. G., Angelica Garciato Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 26 (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT THE KROGER COMPANY TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (Doc. #25 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton that THE KROGER CO.'s time to file a responsive pleading shall be extended by thirty (30) days from 10/28/2022. THE KROGER CO.'s responsive pleading shall be due on or before 11/27/2022, unless otherwise ordered by the district judge to whom this action is transferred. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • Docket(#26) TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: It appears to this Court that this case is a tag-along case to MDL No. 3043 IN RE: Acetaminophen ASD/ADHD Products Liability Litigation. Pursuant to JPML Rule 7.1, "[a]ny party or counsel in actions previously transferred under Section 1407 shall promptly notify the Clerk of the Panel of any potential tag-along actions in which that party is also named or in which that counsel appears." Plaintiff is ordered to show cause within five (5) days from the date of this Order as to whether it has given notice in compliance with Rule 7.1. A declaration attaching a copy of the notice will be deemed sufficient compliance with this Order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Kroger, Co. answer now due 11/28/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant The Kroger, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lara, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant The Kroger, Co.. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PETITION for Appointment of Angelica Garcia as Guardian ad Litem for J.M.G. filed by Plaintiffs Angelica Garcia, Angelica Garcia, as Guardian Ad Litem of J.M.G., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Angelica Garcia, Angelica Garcia, as Guardian Ad Litem of J.M.G., Minor, identifying Angelica Garcia, J.M.G., Minor, CVS Pharmacy Inc., The Kroger, Co.. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Angelica Garcia, Angelica Garcia, as Guardian Ad Litem of J.M.G., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Angelica Garcia, Angelica Garcia, as Guardian Ad Litem of J.M.G., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Angelica Garcia, Angelica Garcia, as Guardian Ad Litem of J.M.G., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33886481 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Angelica Garcia, Angelica Garcia, as Guardian Ad Litem of J.M.G., Minor. (Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton added to party Angelica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton added to party Angelica Garcia, as Guardian Ad Litem of J.M.G., Minor(pty:pla))(Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen Lee Richer