This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2021 at 07:42:27 (UTC).

Angelica Deras v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Angelica Deras filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04106

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angelica Deras

Defendants

LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA,

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Glenn R Kantor

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Sarah J Demers

Attorney at Kantor and Kantor LLP

19839 Nordhoff Street

Northridge, CA 91324

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel W Maguire

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

Keiko J Kojima

Attorney at Burke Williams and Sorensen LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2953

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 7/22/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Keiko J Kojima added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angelica Deras, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, by serving Gabriela Sanchez - Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Demers, Sarah) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (car) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angelica Deras, (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Angelica Deras. (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angelica Deras. (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31306658 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Angelica Deras. (Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Angelica Deras(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 7/22/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Keiko J Kojima added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Kojima, Keiko) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Angelica Deras, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 6/1/2021, answer due 6/22/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Registered Agent, by serving Gabriela Sanchez - Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Demers, Sarah) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (car) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Angelica Deras, (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Angelica Deras. (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Angelica Deras. (Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31306658 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Angelica Deras. (Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Angelica Deras(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keiko J Kojima

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel W. Maguire