This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/02/2022 at 18:58:45 (UTC).

Angeles v. Zinus, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 Angeles filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Zinus, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George B. Daniels. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-10829

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jenisa Angeles

Defendant

Zinus, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Rozenberg

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

One University Plaza, Ste 620

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Defendant Attorney

William Cusack, III

Attorney at Ceccarelli Law Firm PLLC

48 Wall Street, 11Th Floor

New York, NY 10005-2903

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint and Notice of Settlement in Principle addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from William Cusack dated February 23, 2021. Document filed by Zinus, Inc...(Cusack, William) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/24/2021) (ks) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER: This Court having been advised that the parties have reached agreement on all issues in this matter, the Clerk of Court is hereby ORDERED to close the above-captioned action, without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if an application to restore is made within sixty (60) days. All conferences previously scheduled are adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/16/2021) (mml) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: This Court having been advised that the parties have reached agreement on all issues in this matter, the Clerk of Court is hereby ORDERED to close the above-captioned action, without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if an application to restore is made within sixty (60) days. All conferences previously scheduled are adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/16/2021) (mml) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Zinus, Inc. answer due 3/22/2021. (ks) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/24/2021) (ks) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint and Notice of Settlement in Principle addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from William Cusack dated February 23, 2021. Document filed by Zinus, Inc...(Cusack, William) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Zinus, Inc. served on 12/30/2020, answer due 2/12/2021. Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 01/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Zinus, Inc. answer due 2/12/2021. (nb) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/14/2021) (nb) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from William Cusack dated January 13, 2021. Document filed by Zinus, Inc...(Cusack, William) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Fuger Cusack, III on behalf of Zinus, Inc...(Cusack, William) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/25/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/7/2021) (jwh) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zinus, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zinus, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Zinus, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23156300)Document filed by Jenisa Angeles..(Rozenberg, Mark) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zinus, Inc. is a litigant