This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2019 at 07:47:17 (UTC).

Angel v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 Angel filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Timothy J. Cavan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00109

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Timothy J. Cavan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Florentine Angel

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vincent A. Salminen

Attorney at SCHEVECK & SALMINEN LAW FIRM, PLLC

2223 Montana Ave., Suite 202

Billings, MT 59101

Steven J. Harman

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

2601 Minnesota Ave., Suite 2

Billings, MT 59101

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on United States Attorney, Billings, MT Office, Patti Helsley on 10/7/2019, filed by Florentine Angel. (Salminen, Vincent) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Reissued as to United States of America. (Original to atty V. Salminen) (JDR) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Original mailed to atty V. Salminen) (JDR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Florentine Angel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on United States Attorney, Billings, MT Office, Patti Helsley on 10/7/2019, filed by Florentine Angel. (Salminen, Vincent) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Reissued as to United States of America. (Original to atty V. Salminen) (JDR) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2383038 (JDR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Original mailed to atty V. Salminen) (JDR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Florentine Angel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less