This case was last updated from PACER on 04/08/2020 at 06:39:41 (UTC).

Andujar-Johnson v. Singh et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Andujar-Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Singh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00102

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tammy Andujar-Johnson

Defendants

A Gill Trucking, LLC

Ramnpreet Singh

FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.

Balkaran Singh

Sooch Trucking, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael E. Carr

Attorney at Carr & Carr (Tulsa)

4416 S Harvard

Tulsa, OK 74135

Blake D. Beeler

Attorney at Carr & Carr

1350 Sw 89Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73159

Defendant Attorneys

Paul M. Kolker

Attorney at Roberson Kolker Cooper & Goeres, PC

16408 Muirfield Pl

Edmond, OK 73013

Brad L. Roberson

Attorney at Roberson, Kolker, Cooper & Goeres, PC

16408 Muirfield Place

Edmond, OK 73013

Joshua L. Mareschal

Attorney at McAnany Van Cleave & Phillips (MO)

4650 S National Ave, Ste D-2

Springfield, MO 65810

Lauren N. Watson

Attorney at Roberson Kolker Cooper & Goeres, PC

16408 Muirfield Pl

Edmond, OK 73013

 

Court Documents

2 #26

Exhibit 26 - Bus. Search Sooch

2 #25

Exhibit 25 - Sooch Cert of Existence

2 #22

Exhibit 22 - A Gil Art. of Inc.

2 #21

Exhibit 21 - A Gill Trucking Tax Form

2 #20

Exhibit 20 - Order to Substitute

2 #19

Exhibit 19 - Entry of Appearance

2 #18

Exhibit 18 - Change of Address

2 #17

Exhibit 17 - Cert of Service

2 #16

Exhibit 16 - Motion FedEx

2 #15

Exhibit 15 - Answer FedEx

2 #14

Exhibit 14 - Entry of Appearance

2 #13

Exhibit 13 - Entry of Appearance

2 #11

Exhibit 11 - Service Sooch Trucking

2 #10

Exhibit 10 - Service R. Singh

2 #9

Exhibit 9 - Service FedEx

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Muskogee County District Court, case number CJ-2019-436 by Balkaran Singh (With attachments)(nm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 4/7/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1356509 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Balkaran Singh (Watson, Lauren) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lauren N. Watson on behalf of Balkaran Singh (Watson, Lauren) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Defendant to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Defendant's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 4/14/2020)(nm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Muskogee County District Court, case number CJ-2019-436 by Balkaran Singh (With attachments)(nm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Balkaran Singh (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against A Gill Trucking, LLC, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Balkaran Singh, Ramnpreet Singh, Sooch Trucking, LLC by Tammy Andujar-Johnson (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.