Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/24/2021 at 10:20:42 (UTC).

Andrus et al v. Assured Recovery LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 Andrus filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Assured Recovery LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen C Dries and Brett Ludwig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00376

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stephen C Dries

Brett Ludwig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrus Sylvia

Todd Andrus

Sylvia Andrus

Defendants

Assured Recovery LLC

American Credit Acceptance LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan E DeLadurantey

Attorney at DeLadurantey Law Office LLC

330 S Executive Dr - Ste 109

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant Attorney

Paul Gamboa

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1 N Franklin - Ste 800

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) DISCLOSURE Statement by Assured Recovery LLC. (Gamboa, Paul)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Assured Recovery LLC.(Gamboa, Paul)

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Assured Recovery LLC. (Gamboa, Paul)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Gamboa on behalf of Assured Recovery LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Paul Gamboa (Gamboa, Paul)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Credit Acceptance LLC - Waiver sent on 3/25/2021. (DeLadurantey, Nathan)

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Todd Andrus,Sylvia Andrus. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) Modified on 3/26/2021 (kah).

1 #3

Summons Assured Recovery

1 #2

Summons American Credit Acceptance

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against American Credit Acceptance LLC, Assured Recovery LLC by Todd Andrus, Sylvia Andrus. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3775244) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons American Credit Acceptance, #3 Summons Assured Recovery)(DeLadurantey, Nathan) Modified on 3/26/2021 (kah).

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DISCLOSURE Statement by Assured Recovery LLC. (Gamboa, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Assured Recovery LLC.(Gamboa, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Judge Brett Ludwig. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sylvia Andrus, Todd Andrus. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (DeLadurantey, Nathan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE from the clerk to BOTH PLAINTIFF AND DEFT ASSURED RECOVERY LLC requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 14 days; the form is available #here. (kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 4/22/21. Assured Recovery LLC's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. #5 , is GRANTED. Assured's answer is now due 5/12/2021. (cc: all counsel)(jh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Assured Recovery LLC. (Gamboa, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Gamboa on behalf of Assured Recovery LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Paul Gamboa (Gamboa, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by American Credit Acceptance LLC - Waiver sent on 3/25/2021. (DeLadurantey, Nathan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to American Credit Acceptance LLC, Assured Recovery LLC. (kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Todd Andrus,Sylvia Andrus. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) Modified on 3/26/2021 (kah).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against American Credit Acceptance LLC, Assured Recovery LLC by Todd Andrus, Sylvia Andrus. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3775244) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons American Credit Acceptance, #3 Summons Assured Recovery)(DeLadurantey, Nathan) Modified on 3/26/2021 (kah).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Credit Acceptance, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Gamboa