This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2020 at 09:00:19 (UTC).

Andros v. Delta Brayola LTD et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Andros filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Delta Brayola LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Naomi Reice Buchwald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07815

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Naomi Reice Buchwald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Margot Andros

Defendants

Delta Brayola LTD

Delta Galil USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Henry Bell

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Kate Greenspon

Marsha Jessica Indych

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Paul M. Gelb to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22689068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Delta Brayola LTD, Delta Galil USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Greenspon, Amanda) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Kristopher S. Davis, New Attorney: Paul M. Gelb, Address: Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP, 1925 Century Park E Ste 2300, Los Angeles, CA, United States 90067, 3106011106. Document filed by Delta Brayola LTD, Delta Galil USA Inc...(Greenspon, Amanda) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Kate Greenspon on behalf of Delta Brayola LTD, Delta Galil USA Inc...(Greenspon, Amanda) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#8

(#8) LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Henry Bell dated October 14, 2020 re: Letter in Response to Defendants' Letter Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference.. Document filed by Margot Andros..(Bell, Henry) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Henry Bell on behalf of Margot Andros..(Bell, Henry) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#6

(#6) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Marsha J. Indych dated September 29, 2020. Document filed by Delta Brayola LTD, Delta Galil USA Inc...(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#5

(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Delta Galil Industries, Ltd. for Delta Brayola LTD. Document filed by Delta Brayola LTD, Delta Galil USA Inc...(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Henry Bell on 09/22/2020. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by Delta Galil USA Inc...(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Delta Galil Industries, Ltd. for Delta Galil USA Inc.. Document filed by Delta Galil USA Inc...(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removl

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 653721/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21787640).Document filed by Delta Galil USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removl).(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Paul M. Gelb to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22689068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Delta Brayola LTD, Delta Galil USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Greenspon, Amanda) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Kristopher S. Davis, New Attorney: Paul M. Gelb, Address: Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP, 1925 Century Park E Ste 2300, Los Angeles, CA, United States 90067, 3106011106. Document filed by Delta Brayola LTD, Delta Galil USA Inc...(Greenspon, Amanda) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Kate Greenspon on behalf of Delta Brayola LTD, Delta Galil USA Inc...(Greenspon, Amanda) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Conference held on 10/27/2020. (ade) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketThe dial-in for today's 10:30 AM teleconference is (888) 363-4749, access code: 2712517. ORDER (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald) (Text Only Order) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Henry Bell dated October 14, 2020 re: Letter in Response to Defendants' Letter Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference.. Document filed by Margot Andros..(Bell, Henry) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Henry Bell on behalf of Margot Andros..(Bell, Henry) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Marsha J. Indych dated September 29, 2020. Document filed by Delta Brayola LTD, Delta Galil USA Inc...(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Delta Galil Industries, Ltd. for Delta Brayola LTD. Document filed by Delta Brayola LTD, Delta Galil USA Inc...(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Henry Bell on 09/22/2020. Service was made by Federal Express. Document filed by Delta Galil USA Inc...(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marsha Jessica Indych. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $14,583,333,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 146,000. (dnh) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Delta Galil Industries, Ltd. for Delta Galil USA Inc.. Document filed by Delta Galil USA Inc...(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 653721/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21787640).Document filed by Delta Galil USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removl).(Indych, Marsha) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less