This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2020 at 11:03:21 (UTC).

ANDREWS v. THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 ANDREWS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01221

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL ANDREWS

Defendant

THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Michael Baggett

Attorney at McCann, Garland, Ridal & Burke

11 Stanwix Street, Suite 2125

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant Attorneys

Paul M. Mannix

Attorney at Marcus & Shapira LLP

One Oxford Centre, 35Th Floor, 301 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-6401

Lauren A. Melfa Catanzarite

Attorney at Marcus & Shapira, LLP

310 Grant Street, One Oxford Centre, 35Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint and Additional Defense by THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Mannix, Paul) Modified on 10/15/2020 (jjg). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER. The Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is hereby RESCHEDULED for 10/20/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/13/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mannix, Paul) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Mannix, Paul) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER. The Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is hereby RESCHEDULED for 10/20/2020 at 01:00 PM before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/24/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren A. Melfa Catanzarite on behalf of THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Melfa Catanzarite, Lauren) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH Answer due from THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH on 10/15/2020. (Mannix, Paul) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Rule 26(f) report (av) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 9/28/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/28/2020; Stipulation Selecting ADR process due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/20/2020. (av) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD 20-05240. Copies attached: Notice to Defend, Complaint, Exhibits 1 - 4, Civil Cover Sheet (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5842815), filed by THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jmm) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren A. Melfa Catanzarite

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul M. Mannix