This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/13/2021 at 08:34:51 (UTC).

Andrews v. Oklahoma Workers Compensation Commission et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Andrews filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Oklahoma Workers Compensation Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00609

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Ray Andrews

Defendants

Mark Liotta

Oklahoma Workers Compensation Commission

Andrea Delling

Hopper Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patricia A Podolec

Attorney at Patricia A Podolec Attorney at Law

10601 S Western, Suite 119

Oklahoma City, OK 73170

Rachel L Bussett

Attorney at Bussett Legal Group PLLC

2201 N Classen Blvd

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

Defendant Attorneys

Desiree D Singer

Attorney at Attorney General's Ofc-NE 21STREET-OKC

313 Ne 21St St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

Lauren J Ray

Attorney at Attorney General's Ofc-NE 21STREET-OKC

313 Ne 21St St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

 

Court Documents

11 #4

Attachment Poff v. Okla. ex rel., ODMHSAS (unpublished case)

11 #3

Attachment McClelland v. CommunityCare HMO, Inc. (unpublished case)

11 #2

Attachment Eagle Air Med Corp v Martin (unpublished case)

11 #1

Attachment Atuahene v City of Hartford (unpublished case)

11 #11

Main Document

#10

#9

8 #4

Attachment Poff v. Okla. ex rel., ODMHSAS (unpublished case)

8 #3

Criminal Cover Sheet McClelland v. CommunityCare HMO, Inc. (unpublished case)

8 #2

Attachment Eagle Air Med Corp v Martin (unpublished case)

8 #1

Attachment Atuahene v City of Hartford (unpublished case)

8 #8

Main Document

#7

#6

4 #3

Attachment McClelland v. CommunityCare HMO, Inc. (unpublished case)

4 #2

Attachment Eagle Air Med Corp v Martin (unpublished case)

4 #1

Attachment Atuahene v City of Hartford (unpublished case)

4 #4

Main Document

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Atuahene v City of Hartford (unpublished case), #2 Attachment Eagle Air Med Corp v Martin (unpublished case), #3 Attachment McClelland v. CommunityCare HMO, Inc. (unpublished case), #4 Attachment Poff v. Okla. ex rel., ODMHSAS (unpublished case))(Ray, Lauren) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss; granting #9 Motion for Leave to Amend Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 8/5/21. (jw) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to file Amended Motion to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Ray, Lauren) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss (Corrected) and Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Atuahene v City of Hartford (unpublished case), #2 Attachment Eagle Air Med Corp v Martin (unpublished case), #3 Criminal Cover Sheet McClelland v. CommunityCare HMO, Inc. (unpublished case), #4 Attachment Poff v. Okla. ex rel., ODMHSAS (unpublished case))(Ray, Lauren) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Ray, Lauren) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER denying as Moot #4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 7/15/21. (jw) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by All Plaintiffs.(Bussett, Rachel) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Atuahene v City of Hartford (unpublished case), #2 Attachment Eagle Air Med Corp v Martin (unpublished case), #3 Attachment McClelland v. CommunityCare HMO, Inc. (unpublished case), #4 Attachment Poff v. Okla. ex rel., ODMHSAS (unpublished case))(Ray, Lauren) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Desiree D Singer on behalf of All Defendants (Singer, Desiree) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren J Ray on behalf of All Defendants (Ray, Lauren) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3704326. (Ray, Lauren) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-4364 filed by Hopper Smith(individual), Mark Liotta(in his official capacity), Oklahoma Workers Compensation Commission, Andrea Delling(individually), Andrea Delling(in her official capacity), Mark Liotta(individually), Hopper Smith(in his official capacity). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSCN Case Details, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petiton, #3 Exhibit 3 - First Amended Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 - EOA - Patricia Podolec, #5 Exhibit 5 - EOA - Felina Rivera, #6 Exhibit 6 - EOA - Kindra Avila, #7 Exhibit 7 - Motion for Extension to Serve, #8 Exhibit 8 - Order Granting Motion, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(kah) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia A Podolec

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel L Bussett