This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 07:17:39 (UTC).

ANDREWS v. NIKE, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 ANDREWS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NIKE, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02793

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JISELLE ANDREWS

Defendant

NIKE, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAROLD JEFFREY BRAHIN

Attorney at H. JEFFREY BRAHIN, ESQUIRE

37 North Hamilton Street

Doylestown, PA 18901-3616

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL T. MCDONNELL, III

Attorney at KUTAK ROCK LLP

1760 Market St Suite 1100

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by NIKE, Inc..(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER:. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/12/2021. 7/12/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

6 #1

CONSENT FORM

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by NIKE, Inc..(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

4 #1

Arbitration Certification Form

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Nike, Inc. with Certificate of Service by NIKE, Inc..(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL T. MCDONNELL, III on behalf of NIKE, Inc. with Certificate of Service(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NIKE, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15209780), filed by NIKE, Inc..(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by NIKE, Inc..(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER:. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/12/2021. 7/12/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice Re: Arbitration Consent of Videoconference (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(cjh, ) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by NIKE, Inc..(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter re: Arbitration Certification (Attachments: #1 Arbitration Certification Form)(sbt, ) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Nike, Inc. with Certificate of Service by NIKE, Inc..(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL T. MCDONNELL, III on behalf of NIKE, Inc. with Certificate of Service(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NIKE, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15209780), filed by NIKE, Inc..(MCDONNELL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nike, Inc. is a litigant