This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2021 at 10:21:21 (UTC).

Andrews v. Beech-Nut Nutrition Company

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Andrews filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas J. McAvoy, Christian F. Hummel and David N. Hurd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00815

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christian F. Hummel

Presiding Judges

Thomas J. McAvoy

David N. Hurd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Asyia Andrews

Defendant

Beech-Nut Nutrition Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James E. Hacker

Attorney at E. Stewart Jones Hacker Murphy, LLP

28 Second Street - Suite 203

Troy, NY 12180

Julie A. Nociolo

Attorney at E. Stewart Jones Hacker Murphy, LLP

28 Second Street - Suite 203

Troy, NY 12180

Michael P. Canty

Attorney at Labaton Sucharow LLP

140 Broadway - 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Randolph F. Treece

Attorney at Jones, Hacker, Murphy LLP

28 Second Street

Troy, NY 12180

Defendant Attorney

Kathleen E. McCarthy

Attorney at King, Spalding Law Firm - NY Office

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036-4003

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit A to Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit B to Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#6

#7

#8

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER Consolidate Actions. The action 1:21-cv-133 shall be deemed the LEAD CASE. All other actions will be deemed MEMBER CASES. All further filings shall be made in the LEAD CASE: 1:21-cv-133. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 8/10/2021. (khr) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy recused. Case reassigned to Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 8/5/2021. (amt) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE by Asyia Andrews submitted to Judge Hon. Thomas J. McAvoy. (Hacker, James) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beech-Nut Nutrition Company identifying Corporate Parent Hero Beteiligungen AG, Corporate Parent Hero USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Hero AG, Corporate Parent Schwartau International GmbH, Corporate Parent AOH Nahrungsmittel GmbH & Co. KG for Beech-Nut Nutrition Company.. (McCarthy, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen E. McCarthy on behalf of Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (McCarthy, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER approving the Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/21/2021. (amt) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketTEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:21-cv-133; 1:21-cv-167; 1:21-cv-183; 1:21-cv-186; 1:21-cv-200; 1:21-cv-213; 1:21-cv-229; 1:21-cv227; 1:21-cv258; 1:21-cv271; 1;21-cv285; 1:21-cv-271; 1:21-cv-285; 1:21-cv-334; 1:21-cv-511; 1:21-cv-483; 1:21-cv-283; 1:21-cv-756; 1:21-cv-722. (khr) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/18/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/12/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)(Courtesy copy mailed to Attorney Villegas) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Carol Villegas, Labton Sucharow LLP, 140 Broadway, New York, NY 10005, Email address is cvillegas@labaton.com. Phone number is 212-907-0700. Admissions due by 8/2/2021. (khr) (Copy of Notice was emailed to Attorney) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Beech-Nut Nutrition Company. (khr) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Beech-Nut Nutrition Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5588183) filed by Asyia Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A to Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit B to Civil Cover Sheet)(khr) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beech-Nut Nutrition Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen Elizabeth McCarthy