This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2020 at 09:29:48 (UTC).

Andrews et al v. McFarland et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 Andrews filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against McFarland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan P. Watters and Timothy J. Cavan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00026

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

Referral Judge

Timothy J. Cavan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Brenna Andrews

McKennah Andrews

Defendants and Counter Claimants

David McFarland

Does I-V

Knight Transport, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

James R. Jackson

Attorney at ZACHARY PETER LOWE, LC

6028 S. Ridgeline Dr., Ste. 200

Ogden, UT 84405

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Robert M. Carlson

Attorney at CORETTE BLACK CARLSON & MICKELSON

129 West Park Street, Po Box 509

Butte, MT 59703

Marshal L. Mickelson

Attorney at CORETTE BLACK CARLSON & MICKELSON

129 West Park Street, Po Box 509

Butte, MT 59703

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Pleadings

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

State Court File

2 #2

File Receipt

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Mailing of Consent - Honorable Timothy Cavan as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel James R. Jackson, Marshal L. Mickelson, Robert M. Carlson. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/1/2020. (ACC) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/28/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/28/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/28/2020. (JDR) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketRemark - Attorney James Jackson admitted to bar and added to case. (JEH) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDERED: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a), a telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference shall be held on June 4, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan. Lead trial counsel for the respective parties, and any individual proceeding pro se, are required to participate in the conference. Counsel shall use the Courts conferencing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 4/16/2020. (HEG) Modified on 4/20/2020 - Regenerated NEF 4/17/2020 to include attorney J. Jackson. (JEH). (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) State Court ORDER (Case Scheduling Order) (JDR) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) State Court ORDER (Order Setting Case Scheduling COnference) (JDR) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER filed in State Court to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Brenna Andrews. (JDR) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER filed in State Court to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand and COUNTERCLAIM against Brenna Andrews by Knight Transport, LLC, David McFarland. (JDR) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Does I-V, Knight Transport, LLC, David McFarland, filed by Brenna Andrews, McKennah Andrews. (JDR) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Does I-V, Knight Transport, LLC, David McFarland, filed by Brenna Andrews, McKennah Andrews. (JDR) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT FILE: DV-2019-13, MT 6th Judicial District Court, Sweetgrass County. Case Register Report. (Attachments: #1 State Court File, #2 File Receipt) (JDR) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2458679 (JDR) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Knight Transport, LLC, David McFarland from MT 6th Judicial District, Sweetgrass County, case number DV-2019-13., filed by Knight Transport, LLC, David McFarland. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M. Carlson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marshal L. Mickelson