This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 15:04:56 (UTC).

Andrew Stroud v. Scuba Mania, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 Andrew Stroud filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Scuba Mania, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00545

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Stroud

Defendants

Randy Smith

Anthony Falzone

John Moss

Does 1-100, Inclusive

Riviera Charters, LLC

C and N Lins Inc.

James Grundy

MV Riviera

Scuba Mania, Inc.

C and N Lins Inc. doing business as Catalina Divers Supply

Scuba Mania, Inc. doing business as Beach Cities Scuba

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jorge Anthony Lopez

Attorney at Jorgensen and Salberg LLP

15137 Woodlawn Avenue

Tustin, CA 92780

Richard Allen Jorgensen

Attorney at Jorgensen and Salberg LLP

15137 Woodlawn Avenue

Tustin, CA 92780

Jeffrey R Salberg

Attorney at Jorgensen and Salberg LLP

15137 Woodlawn Avenue

Tustin, CA 92780

Defendant Attorneys

Neil S Lerner

Attorney at Cox Wootton Lerner Griffin and Hansen LLP

12011 San Vincente Boulevard Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Mina M Morkos

Attorney at Cox Wootton Lerner Griffin and Hansen LLP

12011 San Vicente Boulevard Suite 600

Los Angeles, CA 90049-4948

Mark M Williams

Attorney at La Follette Johnson De Haas Fesler and Ames

865 South Figueroa Street 32D Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5431

Raymond Joseph Muro

Attorney at Nelson Griffin LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Thomas J Griffin

Attorney at Nelson Griffin LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Steven Alexander Garcia

Attorney at Nelson Griffin LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#29

#27

#26

25 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

13 #4

Proposed Order

13 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

13 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

13 #1

Declaration Declaration of Jorge A. Lopez in Support of Plaintiff's Motion

#13

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhhibit 1--part 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1-part 1

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE filed by defendant Riviera Charters, LLC. OF FILING OF RELATED ACTION (Williams, Mark) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the 3/21/2019 Scheduling Conference is hereby continued for hearing to 4/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Motion to Remand #13 is taken off the 3/21/2019 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 3/21/2019.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) REPLY to Defendant Scuba Mania, Inc.'s Opposition filed by Plaintiff Andrew Stroud. (Jorgensen, Richard) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) REPLY to Defendant C & N Lins, Inc.'s Opposition filed by Plaintiff Andrew Stroud. (Jorgensen, Richard) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) REPLY to Defendants Anthony Falzone's and Randy Smith's Opposition filed by Plaintiff Andrew Stroud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Jorgensen, Richard) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Andrew Stroud.. (Jorgensen, Richard) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steven Alexander Garcia counsel for Defendant C and N Lins Inc.. Adding Steven A. Garcia as counsel of record for C & N LINS Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant C & N LINS Inc. dba Catalina Divers Supply. (Garcia, Steven) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Torrance Courthouse #13 filed by Defendants Anthony Falzone, Randy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opposition of Defendants Lee and Falzone)(Lerner, Neil) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Torrance Courthouse #13 filed by Defendant C and N Lins Inc.. (Griffin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to REMAND MOTION filed by Defendant MV Riviera. (Williams, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant C and N Lins Inc..(Griffin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Smith and Falzone Anthony Falzone, Randy Smith.(Lerner, Neil) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendants MV Riviera.(Williams, Mark) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant MV Riviera, (Williams, Mark) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. No further action is required regarding this item. (esa) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • COPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants C and N Lins Inc., Does 1-100, inclusive, Anthony Falzone, James Grundy, MV Riviera, John Moss, Riviera Charters, LLC, Scuba Mania, Inc., Randy Smith, filed by plaintiff Andrew Stroud. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen L. Stevenson. New Case Number 2:19-cv-00545 FMO (KSx). (esa) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court Dept M Torrance, case number BC691641 Receipt No: 0973-23087118 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant M.V. RIVIERA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-part 1, #2 Exhhibit 1--part 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Mark M Williams added to party M.V. RIVIERA(pty:dft))(Williams, Mark) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C&N LINS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SCUBA MANIA INC is a litigant