This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 07:16:02 (UTC).

Andrew Parker et al v. Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Andrew Parker filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09079

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andrew Parker

Jasmine Leese

Defendants

DOES 1-10

Ford Motor Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sepehr Daghighian

Attorney at California Consumer Attorneys PC

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Michael H Rosenstein

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael H. Rosenstein LC

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Jonathan Carlo Cagliata

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael H. Rosenstein LC

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Spencer Peter Hugret

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Amy Patricia Maclear

Attorney at Gordon Rees Sully Mansukhani LLP

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Hailey Marie Rogerson

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Arielle E. Brown

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully and Mansukhani LLP

275 Battery Street Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#25

(#25) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

23 #1

*Restricted*

#23

(#23) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#24

(#24) Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 9/30/2020 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:20-cv-01023-BAS-MDD from U.S. District Court Southern District of California (San Diego). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB-FFMx. (car) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

22 #1

MDL 2814 Transfer Order dtd 10.2.2020

#22

(#22) Case transferred to District of Central District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California*.*350 W. First St.**Los Angeles, CA 90012* (Attachments: #1 MDL 2814 Transfer Order dtd 10.2.2020) (jdt) (dlg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Stay (ECF No. #18 ). Case stayed. All proceedings in this matter are STAYED pending the decision of the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation as to whether to include this case in the MDL. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/28/20. (jmo) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#18

(#18) Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending JPML Determination of Inclusion in MDL 2814 by Ford Motor Company. (Brown, Arielle) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Harris Rosenstein on behalf of Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker (Rosenstein, Michael) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Declaration fo Spencer P. Hugret

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

State Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-0005423-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13958670.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Declaration fo Spencer P. Hugret, #5 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1023-BAS-MDD. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (car) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Copy of Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 9/30/2020 regarding transfer of Case No. 3:20-cv-01023-BAS-MDD from U.S. District Court Southern District of California (San Diego). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB-FFMx. (car) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Case transferred to District of Central District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California*.*350 W. First St.**Los Angeles, CA 90012* (Attachments: #1 MDL 2814 Transfer Order dtd 10.2.2020) (jdt) (dlg). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Stay (ECF No. #18 ). Case stayed. All proceedings in this matter are STAYED pending the decision of the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation as to whether to include this case in the MDL. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/28/20. (jmo) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference. The Court finds good cause to vacate the ENE/CMC pending a ruling on the Motion to Stay or if the case is ordered transferred. If the Motion to Stay is denied the parties must contact the Court within five (5) days to reschedule the ENE/CMC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 07/27/2020. (no document attached) (atk) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DECLARATION re #17 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Plaintiffs Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker. (Cagliata, Jonathan) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint MOTION to Stay All Proceedings and Deadlines Pending JPML Determination of Inclusion in MDL 2814 by Ford Motor Company. (Brown, Arielle) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker. (Cagliata, Jonathan) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Ford Motor Company of case(s) 2814-AB Notice of Related Cases. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Hailey Rogerson by Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMY MACLEAR by Amy Maclear on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service)(Maclear, Amy)Attorney Amy Maclear added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Spencer P. Hugret by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service 2020-06-04 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Carlo Cagliata on behalf of Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker (Cagliata, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Carlo Cagliata added to party Jasmine Leese (pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Carlo Cagliata added to party Andrew Parker(pty:pla) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sepehr Daghighian on behalf of Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker (Daghighian, Sepehr)Attorney Sepehr Daghighian added to party Jasmine Leese (pty:pla), Attorney Sepehr Daghighian added to party Andrew Parker(pty:pla) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Harris Rosenstein on behalf of Jasmine Leese, Andrew Parker (Rosenstein, Michael) (jmo). [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-0005423-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13958670.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Declaration fo Spencer P. Hugret, #5 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1023-BAS-MDD. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 10/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less