This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 10:52:35 (UTC).

Andresen v. Terex Advance Mixer, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Andresen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Terex Advance Mixer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon E DeGuilio and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00676

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon E DeGuilio

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathryn Andresen

Defendants

Terex Advance Mixer, Inc

Terex Corporation

Ozinga Bros. Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew S Buchanan PHV

Attorney at Buchanan Williams & O'Brien PC

1105 E 32Nd St Ste 5

Joplin, MO 64804

James V O'Brien PHV

Attorney at Buchanan Williams & O'Brien PC

1105 E 32Nd St Ste 5

Joplin, MO 64804

Defendant Attorneys

Jordan M Slusher

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Ind/IN

201 N Illinois St Ste 1900, Po Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244

Kevin C Schiferl

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Ind/IN

201 N Illinois St Ste 1900, Po Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244

Hayleigh J Neumann

Attorney at Hennessy & Roach PC - Ind/IN

8910 Purdue Rd Ste 690

Indianapolis, IN 46268

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ozinga Bros. Inc.. (Neumann, Hayleigh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#19

(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to subject matter filed by Ozinga Bros. Inc.. (Neumann, Hayleigh) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to subject matter filed by Kathryn Andresen. (Buchanan PHV, Andrew) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Andresen. Terex Advance Mixer, Inc served on 10/13/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. (Buchanan PHV, Andrew) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Andresen. Terex Corporation served on 10/13/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. (Buchanan PHV, Andrew) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Terex Advance Mixer, Inc, Terex Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Terex Corporation for Terex Advance Mixer, Inc.. (Slusher, Jordan) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M Slusher on behalf of Terex Advance Mixer, Inc, Terex Corporation (Slusher, Jordan) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Proposed Summons filed by Kathryn Andresen. (Buchanan PHV, Andrew) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#7

(#7) Proposed Summons filed by Kathryn Andresen. (Buchanan PHV, Andrew) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#6

(#6) BRIEF in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to subject matter filed by Ozinga Bros. Inc.. (Neumann, Hayleigh) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

5 #1

Proposed Order

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Hayleigh J Neumann on behalf of Ozinga Bros. Inc. (Neumann, Hayleigh) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew S. Buchanan PHV for Kathryn Andresen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/22/2021. (ace) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#2

1 #1

Envelope

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ozinga Bros. Inc.. (Neumann, Hayleigh) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to subject matter filed by Ozinga Bros. Inc.. (Neumann, Hayleigh) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to subject matter filed by Kathryn Andresen. (Buchanan PHV, Andrew) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Andresen. Terex Advance Mixer, Inc served on 10/13/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. (Buchanan PHV, Andrew) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathryn Andresen. Terex Corporation served on 10/13/2021, answer due 12/1/2021. (Buchanan PHV, Andrew) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Terex Advance Mixer, Inc, Terex Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Terex Corporation for Terex Advance Mixer, Inc.. (Slusher, Jordan) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline 12/1/2021 (slm) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M Slusher on behalf of Terex Advance Mixer, Inc, Terex Corporation (Slusher, Jordan) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF AGREED INITIAL EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO Plaintiffs Complaint by Defendants Terex Advance Mixer, Inc, Terex Corporation. (Schiferl, Kevin) Modified on 10/18/2021 (slm). (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Schiferl on behalf of Terex Advance Mixer, Inc, Terex Corporation (Schiferl, Kevin) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Application for Attorney James Vincent O'Brien to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kathryn Andresen. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4711298(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Terex Advance Mixer, Inc, Terex Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons filed by Kathryn Andresen. (Buchanan PHV, Andrew) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons filed by Kathryn Andresen. (Buchanan PHV, Andrew) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to subject matter filed by Ozinga Bros. Inc.. (Neumann, Hayleigh) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to subject matter by Defendant Ozinga Bros. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neumann, Hayleigh) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Hayleigh J Neumann on behalf of Ozinga Bros. Inc. (Neumann, Hayleigh) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew S. Buchanan PHV for Kathryn Andresen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 9/22/2021. (ace) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Attorney Andrew S. Buchanan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kathryn Andresen ; Pro Hac Vice fee of $96 has been received; Receipt #INN3027631. (ace) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/22/2021 to include Federal Court admission dates) (ace). Modified on 9/22/2021 (ace). (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ozinga Bros. Inc., Terex Advance Mixer, Inc, Terex Corporation (Filing fee $ 402.00.) Receipt #3027632, filed by Kathryn Andresen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(No proposed summons received)(kms) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OZINGA BROS. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TEREX CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan M Slusher

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin C. Schiferl