This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2021 at 09:51:08 (UTC).

Andres v. Raytheon Technologies Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 Andres filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Raytheon Technologies Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jared M. Strauss and Jose E. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-61757

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jared M. Strauss

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary M. Andres, Sr

Defendants

Raytheon Technologies Corporation

Goodrich Corporation

Wyeth Holdings LLC

Parker-Hannifin Corporation

Flint Hills Resources, LLC

Lockheed Martin Corporation

Kaman Corporation

Bennett Auto Supply, Inc.

Nokia of America Corporation

Curtis-Wright Corporation

Tex-Cote LLC

Schneider Electric USA, Inc.

Leeds & Northrup Company

H.B. Fuller Company

Boeing Company

ViacomCBS Inc.

Koch Industries Inc.

Rohr, Inc.

Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dawn Marie Besserman

Attorney at Maune Raichle Hartley French and Mudd LLC

777 S. Harbour Island Blvd., Ste. 310

Tampa, FL 33602

Jovanni Christopher Fiallo

Attorney at Maune Raichle Hartley French & Mudd

777 S. Harbour Island Blvd., Ste 310

Tampa, FL 33020

Thomas J. Irvin

Attorney at Maune Raichle Hartley French & Mudd

Club Centre Court, Suite 4

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Rae Cachaldora

Attorney at Bice Cole Law Firm, P.L.

999 Ponce De Leon Boulevard, Suite 710

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Melanie Erica Chung-Tims

Attorney at Bice Cole Law Firm, P.L.

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd., Suite 710

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Daniel M. Finer

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Avenue Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Susan Jane Cole

Attorney at Bice Cole Law Firm

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 710

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Evelyn Fletcher Davis

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP

303 Peachtree Street Ne, 4000 Suntrust Plaza

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Todd Carlton Alley

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell Thackston and Young, LLP

4000 Suntrust Plaza, 303 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30308

Edward Joy Briscoe

Attorney at Fowler White Burnett

1395 Brickell Avenue, 14Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131-3302

Peter J. Melaragno

Attorney at Fowler White Burnett

1395 Brickell Avenue, 14Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131-3302

Abbie L. Eliasberg Fuchs

Attorney at Harris Beach PLLC

100 Wall Street, 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Bradley M. Wanner

Attorney at Harris Beach PLLC

677 Broadway, Suite 1101

Albany, NY 12207

Elliot Aaron Hallak

Attorney at Harris Beach PLLC

677 Broadway, Suite 1101

Albany, NY 12207

Syed K. Rizvi

Attorney at Harris Beach PLLC

100 Wall Street, 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Ari Chaim Shapiro

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

100 S.E. Second Street, Suite 3900

Miami, FL 33131

Daniel Alberto Garcia

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

100 Se 2Nd Street, Ste 3900

Miami, FL 33131

John Charles Reddin

Attorney at Luks Santaniello Petrillo and Cohen

150 West Flagler Street, Suite 2600

Miami, FL 33130

Stuart L. Cohen

Attorney at Luks Santaniello

150 West Flagler Street, 2750

Miami, FL 33130

Michael Roland Holt

Attorney at Rumberger Kirk & Caldwell

80 Sw 8Th Street, Suite 3000

Miami, FL 33130-3047

33 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#207

#206

205 #2

Text of Proposed Order

205 #1

Certification

205 #205

Main Document

#204

#203

#202

#201

200 #2

Text of Proposed Order

200 #1

Certification

200 #200

Main Document

#199

197 #1

Text of Proposed Order

197 #197

Main Document

196 #1

Text of Proposed Order

196 #196

Main Document

191 #2

Text of Proposed Order

239 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#207) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, granting #205 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Susan J. Cole, Esq. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#206) Initial Disclosure(s) by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated (Andersen, Donald) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketAttorney Daniel M. Finer representing Raytheon Technologies Corporation (Defendant) Activated. (pt) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#205) Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel M. Finer, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #191 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. Responses due by 10/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cole, Susan) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#204) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#203) ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#202) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW,granting #197 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Casey Renee McGowan representing Dow Chemical Company (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#201) ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW,granting #196 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Casey Renee McGowan representing Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#200) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Will S. Skinner. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15081800 by Teledyne Technologies Incorporated. Responses due by 10/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Andersen, Donald) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#199) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Huntsman Corporation (Jackson-Fannin, Julian) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
190 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of Lockheed Martin Corporation. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Joy Briscoe on behalf of Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co.. Attorney Edward Joy Briscoe added to party Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co.(pty:dft). (Briscoe, Edward) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evelyn Fletcher Davis on behalf of Flint Hills Resources, LLC, Hubbell Lighting Inc., Koch Industries Inc.. Attorney Evelyn Fletcher Davis added to party Flint Hills Resources, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evelyn Fletcher Davis added to party Hubbell Lighting Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Evelyn Fletcher Davis added to party Koch Industries Inc.(pty:dft). (Davis, Evelyn) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Carlton Alley on behalf of Flint Hills Resources, LLC, Hubbell Lighting Inc., Koch Industries Inc.. Attorney Todd Carlton Alley added to party Flint Hills Resources, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Carlton Alley added to party Hubbell Lighting Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Carlton Alley added to party Koch Industries Inc.(pty:dft). (Alley, Todd) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 8/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez. Calendar Call set for 8/11/2022 at 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 6/16/2022. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for discovery matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Removal Status Report due by 9/6/2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Aerojet Rocketdyne, Inc., Bennett Auto Supply, Inc., Boeing Company, Coast Aerospace Manufacturing, Inc., Cooper Industries, LLC, Crane Co., Curtis-Wright Corporation, Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, Dow Chemical Company, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC., Ericsson, Inc., Flint Hills Resources, LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, H.B. Fuller Company, Honeywell Aerospace, Honeywell International, Inc., Hubbell Lighting Inc., Huntsman Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Kaman Corporation, Koch Industries Inc., Leeds & Northrup Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC, Morton International, LLC, Nokia of America Corporation, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Plastics Engineering Company, Pneumo-Abex, LLC, Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rohr, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Shell Chemical LP, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, Tex-Cote LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc. and Wyeth Holdings LLC, Goodrich Corporation, Wyeth Holdings LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Flint Hills Resources, LLC, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Kaman Corporation, Bennett Auto Supply, Inc., Nokia of America Corporation, Curtis-Wright Corporation, Tex-Cote LLC, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Leeds & Northrup Company, H.B. Fuller Company, Boeing Company, ViacomCBS Inc., Koch Industries Inc., Rohr, Inc., Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC, Occidental Chemical Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., Shell Chemical LP, Union Carbide Corporation, Huntsman Corporation, Morton International, LLC, Teledyne Technologies Incorporated, General Electric Company, Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co., Honeywell International, Inc., General Dynamics Corporation, Honeywell Aerospace, Eaton Aeroquip, LLC., Coast Aerospace Manufacturing, Inc., Aerojet Rocketdyne, Inc., Dow Chemical Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC, Ericsson, Inc., Hubbell Lighting Inc., Crane Co., Plastics Engineering Company, Cooper Industries, LLC and Pneumo-Abex, LLC.. Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Aerojet Rocketdyne, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Bennett Auto Supply, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Boeing Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Coast Aerospace Manufacturing, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Cooper Industries, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Curtis-Wright Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Dexter Hysol Aerospace LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Eaton Aeroquip, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Ericsson, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Flint Hills Resources, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party General Dynamics Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Goodrich Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party H.B. Fuller Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Honeywell Aerospace (pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Hubbell Lighting Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Huntsman Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Kaman Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Koch Industries Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Leeds & Northrup Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Lockheed Martin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Mine Safety Appliance Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Morton International, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Nokia of America Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Occidental Chemical Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Parker-Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Plastics Engineering Company(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Pneumo-Abex, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Premix-Marbletite Manufacturing Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Rockwell Automation, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Rohr, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Schneider Electric USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Shell Chemical LP(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Teledyne Technologies Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Tex-Cote LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party ViacomCBS Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Jane Cole added to party Wyeth Holdings LLC(pty:dft). (Cole, Susan) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mee) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14948451,no answer/affirmative defenses filed by Raytheon Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Cole, Susan) Modified text on 8/23/2021 (mee). (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Flint Hills Resources Houston Chemical, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LEEDS AND NORTHRUP COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Koch Industries, Inc., as successor in interest to Koch Investment (UK) Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ROHR INC. DBA GOODRICH AEROSPACE is a litigant