This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 07:49:36 (UTC).

Andree v. Kentwood Public Schools

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Andree filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Kentwood Public Schools. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Phillip J. Green. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00356

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ned F. Andree

Grand Rapids, MI 49507

Defendant

Kentwood Public Schools

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Marshall W. Grate

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC (Grand Rapids)

200 Ottawa Ave., Nw, Ste. 500

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

Gregory N. Longworth

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC (Grand Rapids)

200 Ottawa Ave., Nw, Ste. 500

Grand Rapids, MI 49503

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Kentwood Public Schools re Joint Status Report (Rule 16) #14 (Longworth, Gregory) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#14

(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT (Longworth, Gregory) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/8/2019 at 10:30 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 7/2/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Kentwood Public Schools (Longworth, Gregory) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (ems). (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Kentwood Public Schools re Attorney Appearance, Attorney Appearance (Grate, Marshall) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#8

No Description Available

7 #1

Attachment 1

#7

(#12) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 motion for order; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

6 #1

Attachment 1

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ned F. Andree for Summons and Complaint (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#4

Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #5 , Order on Motion to Serve the Complaint #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Ned F. Andree (ems) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#3

Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Ned F. Andree (ems) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#2

(#4) ORDER denying #2 motion to serve the complaint; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#10) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Kentwood Public Schools (Longworth, Gregory) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (ems). (Entered: 06/05/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Kentwood Public Schools re Joint Status Report (Rule 16) #14 (Longworth, Gregory) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT (Longworth, Gregory) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Ned F. Andree (ems) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/8/2019 at 10:30 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 7/2/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order on Motion for Order #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Ned F. Andree (ems) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 motion for order; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Kentwood Public Schools re Answer to Complaint #10 (Longworth, Gregory) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Kentwood Public Schools (Longworth, Gregory) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (ems). (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Kentwood Public Schools re Attorney Appearance, Attorney Appearance (Grate, Marshall) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gregory N. Longworth on behalf of defendant Kentwood Public Schools (Longworth, Gregory) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ned F. Andree for Summons and Complaint (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #5 , Order on Motion to Serve the Complaint #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Ned F. Andree (ems) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER denying #2 motion to serve the complaint; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Ned F. Andree (ems) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (ems) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Kentwood Public Schools and returned to plaintiff (in the event the motion for service is denied) (ems) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (ems). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to serve the complaint by plaintiff Ned F. Andree; (ems) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number GR065929; for civil filing fee (ems) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kentwood Public Schools filed by Ned F. Andree (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ems) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less