This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2019 at 13:03:54 (UTC).

Andrea Anthonis Smith v. Lincoln Financial Company, dba Lincoln Financial Services, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 Andrea Anthonis Smith filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Lincoln Financial Company, dba Lincoln Financial Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Mitchell D. Dembin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00816

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Ann Bencivengo

Referral Judge

Mitchell D. Dembin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrea Anthonis-Smith

Respondents

Lincoln Finance Company

Ford Motor Credit Company LLC

Equifax Information Services L.L.C.

Experian Information Solutions Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian James Brazier

Attorney at Price Law Group APC

8245 North 85Th Way

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Lauren Tegan Rodkey

Attorney at Price Law Group, APC

6345 Balboa Blvd., Suite 247

Encino, CA 91316

Respondent Attorneys

Rick H Knock

Attorney at Clements and Knock LLP

2825 Fay Avenue Suite 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

Genevieve Rae Walser-Jolly

Attorney at Severson & Werson, APC

19100 Von Karman Avenue, Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92660

Scott J Hyman

Attorney at Severson and Werson

19100 Von Karman, The Atrium Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92612

Thomas P Quinn, Jr

Attorney at Nokes and Quinn

410 Broadway, Suite 200

Laguna Beach, CA 92651

Shahrzad Shariati

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Drive, Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

#71

69 #1

*Restricted*

#69

#68

#67

#61

60 #2

Proposed Order To Transfer

60 #1

Proposed Order To Dismiss

#60

9 #1

Experian

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#71) NOTICE of Settlement by Andrea Anthonis-Smith (Rodkey, Lauren) (anh). (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#69) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-07463. Original file received electronically (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • (#70) Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (jpp) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#68) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE #61 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is DENIED in part to the extent it seeks dismissal for improper venue and GRANTED in part to the extent it seeks to transfer venue. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Case transferred electronically. MD JS-6. Case Terminated (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#67) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS #60 before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#66) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lincoln Finance Company, re Response in Support of Motion, #65 served on 4/12/2019. (Knock, Rick) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#65) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper VenueFirst NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California #60 filed by Defendant Lincoln Finance Company. (Knock, Rick) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper VenueFirst NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California #60 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Anthonis-Smith. (Brazier, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#63) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Lincoln Finance Company, re Declaration (Motion related), #62 , Memorandum in Support of Motion, #61 , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper VenueFirst NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California #60 served on 03/20/2019. (Knock, Rick) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) DECLARATION of Gary Sweet In Support of First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper VenueFirst NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of California #60 filed by Defendant Lincoln Finance Company. (Knock, Rick) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Andrea Anthonis-Smith, upon Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Janice Jordan in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brazier, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., and Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Experian, #2 Ford Motor Credit) (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Anthonis-Smith. (Brazier, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Anthonis-Smith. (Brazier, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Andrea Anthonis-Smith. (Brazier, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andrea Anthonis-Smith, (Brazier, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Andrea Anthonis-Smith. (Brazier, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22314585 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Andrea Anthonis-Smith. (Attorney Brian James Brazier added to party Andrea Anthonis-Smith(pty:pla))(Brazier, Brian) [Transferred from California Central on 5/3/2019.] (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LINCOLN FINANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant