This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2021 at 08:19:10 (UTC).

Andre v. Proofpoint, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Andre filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Proofpoint, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01612

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Andre

Defendants

Jonathan Feiber

Dana Evan

Kevin Harvey

Proofpoint, Inc.

Michael Johnson

Elizabeth Rafael

Richard Wallace

Kristen Gil

Gary Steele

Leyla Seka

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Sadeh

Attorney at Halper Sadeh LLP

667 Madison Avenue, 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10065

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Eric Andre (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/25/2021, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 8/3/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/10/2021. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/17/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

3 #3

Main Document

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Dana Evan, Jonathan Feiber, Kristen Gil, Kevin Harvey, Michael Johnson, Proofpoint, Inc., Elizabeth Rafael, Leyla Seka, Gary Steele, Richard Wallace (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7913981)Attorney Daniel Sadeh added to party Eric Andre(pty:pla), filed by Eric Andre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 7/27/2021. Text Only Entry (angar, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Eric Andre (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER: Due to an unavoidable conflict in the court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/21 by this court's #4 Order is RE-SET in time only to 8/17/21 at 10:00 A.M. The Parties shall use the dial-in information previously provided. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 07/12/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/25/2021, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 8/3/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/10/2021. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 8/17/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Dana Evan, Jonathan Feiber, Kristen Gil, Kevin Harvey, Michael Johnson, Proofpoint, Inc., Elizabeth Rafael, Leyla Seka, Gary Steele, Richard Wallace (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number 1082-7913981)Attorney Daniel Sadeh added to party Eric Andre(pty:pla), filed by Eric Andre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROOFPOINT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Sadeh