This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2020 at 09:46:39 (UTC).

Andre Luiz Costa Soares v. Chad Wolf et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Andre Luiz Costa Soares filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Chad Wolf. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01713

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry J. Hatter, Jr

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Andre Luiz Costa Soares

Adelanto, CA 92301

Respondents

David Marin

Chad Wolf

James Janecka

Warden

William Barr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

OIL-DCS Trial Attorney

Attorney at Office of Immigration Litigation

Po Box 868 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

312 North Spring Street 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4700

David E Pinchas

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, the Government is ordered to file an opposition to Petitioner's motion to reopen case and reconsideration, #7 by no later than October 1, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, the Court hereby dismisses case ED CV 20-1713 as duplicative of case ED CV 20-0837-TJH. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO MOTION TO REOPEN AND RECONSIDER re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Reopen Case NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration #7 filed by Respondents William Barr, James Janecka, David Marin, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney David E Pinchas added to party William Barr(pty:res), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party James Janecka(pty:res), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party David Marin(pty:res), Attorney David E Pinchas added to party Chad Wolf(pty:res))(Pinchas, David) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from Andre Luis Acosta (shb) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, the Government is ordered to file an opposition to Petitioner's motion to reopen case and reconsideration, #7 by no later than October 1, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Reopen Case and Reconsideration filed by Petitioner Andre Luiz Costa Soares. (lom) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. Counsel are hereby notified that pursuant to the Judge's directive, the Court hereby dismisses case ED CV 20-1713 as duplicative of case ED CV 20-0837-TJH. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency Petitioner's reply for Objections from Respondents filed by Petitioner Andre Luiz Costa Soares. (lom) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatters procedures and schedules can be found on the courts website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (esa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, (Filing fee $ due), filed by petitioner Andre Luiz Costa Soares. (esa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for issuance of order to show cause filed by petitioner Andre Luiz Costa Soares. (esa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARDEN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David E Pinchas