This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2021 at 08:17:00 (UTC).

Andracki v. Livingston et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 Andracki filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Livingston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul L. Maloney and Sally J. Berens. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00709

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

Referral Judge

Sally J. Berens

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lisa J Andracki

Lisa J. Andracki

Defendants

Alana M Livingston

Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.

Alana M. Livingston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nolan Lee Erickson

Attorney at Grewal Law PLLC

2290 Science Pkwy.

Okemos, MI 48864

Defendant Attorney

Matthew A. Stone

Attorney at Pedersen Keenan King Wachsberg & Andrzejak PC

4057 Pioneer Dr., Ste. 300

Commerce Township, MI 48390-1363

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Alana M. Livingston re Response to Order to Show Cause, #5 (Stone, Matthew) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

5 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 5

5 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 4

5 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 3

5 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2

5 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

5 #1

Index Index of Exhibits-Response to Order to Show Cause

#5

(#5) RESPONSE by defendant Alana M. Livingston to Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #4 (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits-Response to Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Stone, Matthew) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant to show cause by 9/7/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (pjw) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Alana M Livingston re Notice of Removal #1 and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Stone, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint and Jury Demand

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal from Eaton County Circuit Court case number 21-000414-NI filed by Alana M Livingston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Jury Demand) (Stone, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Alana M. Livingston re Response to Order to Show Cause, #5 (Stone, Matthew) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE by defendant Alana M. Livingston to Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #4 (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits-Response to Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Stone, Matthew) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant to show cause by 9/7/2021; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Alana M. Livingston in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6519637 (Stone, Matthew) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (pjw) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Alana M Livingston re Notice of Removal #1 and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Stone, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal from Eaton County Circuit Court case number 21-000414-NI filed by Alana M Livingston (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint and Jury Demand) (Stone, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. is a litigant