This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2022 at 07:27:30 (UTC).

Andoe v. U.S. Secretary of State, et al.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 Andoe filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against U S Secretary of State,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is B Lynn Winmill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00428

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

B Lynn Winmill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John R. Andoe

Defendants

U.S. Secretary of State

Idaho Secretary of State

Idaho Attorney General

Fifth Judicial District for the State of Idaho

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Cover Letter to Court

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #3

*Restricted*

1 #4

Mailing Envelope

#2

(#2) ORDER of Conditional Filing - caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

envelope

#4

(#4) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John R. Andoe. Responses due by 11/14/2022 (alw)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Exhibit

#7

(#7) ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #4 ) is DENIED. Within 14 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the filing fee of $402.00 or present facts showing that he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. Plaintiffs Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Dkt. #4 ) is DENIED. Within 14 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff must either pay the filing fee of $402.00 or present facts showing that he is in imminent danger of serious physical injury. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Noncompliance - Amended Complaint due by 12/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (alw)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account, This is a sealed document. re #4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John R. Andoe. (Attachments: #1 sptfa)(alw)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John R. Andoe. Responses due by 11/14/2022 (alw)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter from John Andoe(alw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2022: #1 envelope) (alw).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER of Conditional Filing - caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John R. Andoe. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to Court, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit's, #4 Mailing Envelope)(ac) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less