This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2020 at 09:15:13 (UTC).

Andis Company v. Kiss Nail Products Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 Andis Company filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Kiss Nail Products Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen C Dries and Lynn Adelman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01219

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stephen C Dries

Lynn Adelman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andis Company

Defendants

Ivy Enterprises Inc

Kiss Nail Products Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam E Witkov

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

790 N Water St - Ste 2500

Milwaukee, WI 53202-4108

Laura M Konkel

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

1 S Pinckney St - Ste 700, Po Box 1806

Madison, WI 53701-1806

Defendant Attorneys

Grant C Killoran

Attorney at O'Neil Cannon Hollman DeJong & Laing SC

111 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 1400

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Laura J Lavey

Attorney at O'Neil Cannon Hollman DeJong & Laing SC

111 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 1400

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Julie B Albert

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

30 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10112-4498

Joseph Craig

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

1932 Silverwood Ave

Mountain View, CA 94043

Peter H Kang

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

1001 Page Mill Rd - Ste 200

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

#14

13 #5

Exhibit E

13 #4

Exhibit D

13 #3

Exhibit C

13 #2

Exhibit B

13 #1

Exhibit A

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Summons Kiss Nail Products, Inc.

1 #11

Summons Ivy Enterprises, Inc.

1 #10

Exhibit 10-Trimmer Box and Manual

1 #9

Exhibit 9-Red Pro Registration

1 #8

Exhibit 8-June and July 2020 Emails

1 #6

Exhibit 6-Video Screen Shots

1 #5

Exhibit 5-Gray and Burgundy Trade Dress Registration

#1

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/8/20. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on November 20, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ivy Enterprises Inc, Kiss Nail Products Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kang, Peter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE Statement by Ivy Enterprises Inc. (Kang, Peter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE Statement by Kiss Nail Products Inc. (Kang, Peter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Andis Company with Jury Demand filed by Ivy Enterprises Inc, Kiss Nail Products Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Kang, Peter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Craig on behalf of Ivy Enterprises Inc, Kiss Nail Products Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph Craig (Craig, Joseph)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Julie B Albert on behalf of Ivy Enterprises Inc, Kiss Nail Products Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Julie Albert (Albert, Julie)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter H Kang on behalf of Ivy Enterprises Inc, Kiss Nail Products Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Peter Kang (Kang, Peter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/30/20. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS DEADLINE by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Killoran, Grant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura J Lavey on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Laura J. Lavey (Lavey, Laura)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant C Killoran on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Grant C. Killoran (Killoran, Grant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Disclosure Statement and Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge on 9/9/20 by David Lee (Witkov, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, Civil Cover Sheet, Disclosure Statement and Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge on 9/9/20 by David Lee (Witkov, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andis Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Witkov, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Andis Company. (Witkov, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Ivy Enterprises Inc, Kiss Nail Products Inc by Andis Company. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3534589) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-ANDIS Registrations, #2 Exhibit 2-T-OUTLINER Registration, #3 Exhibit 3-OUTLINER Registration, #4 Exhibit 4-GTX Application, #5 Exhibit 5-Gray and Burgundy Trade Dress Registration, #6 Exhibit 6-Video Screen Shots, #7 Exhibit 7-June 18, 2020 Letter, #8 Exhibit 8-June and July 2020 Emails, #9 Exhibit 9-Red Pro Registration, #10 Exhibit 10-Trimmer Box and Manual, #11 Summons Ivy Enterprises, Inc., #12 Summons Kiss Nail Products, Inc., #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Witkov, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KISS NAIL PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ANDIS CONSTRUCTION CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter H Kang

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura J Lavey