This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2019 at 07:55:07 (UTC).

Anderson v. Smith

Case Summary

On 06/18/2019 Anderson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William M Ray, II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02778

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M Ray, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sonya Anderson

Defendant

Anthony Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ralph S. Goldberg

Attorney at Goldberg & Cuvillier, P.C.

1400 Montreal Road, E., Suite 100

Tucker, GA 30084

Laurene C. Cuvillier

Attorney at Goldberg & Cuvillier, P.C.

1400 Montreal Road, E., Suite 100

Tucker, GA 30084

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER against All Defendants filed by Sonya Anderson.(Goldberg, Ralph) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/19/2019 to edit text (rlb). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Anthony Smith. (rlb) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Sonya Anderson (Goldberg, Ralph) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER DENYING #3 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 6/19/19. (jkl) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sonya Anderson. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8737726) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Statement Under Penalty of Perjury of Valerie Crumbsy re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sonya Anderson. (Goldberg, Ralph) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (rlb) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (rlb) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Sonya Anderson (Goldberg, Ralph) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER DENYING #3 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge William M Ray, II on 6/19/19. (jkl) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Statement Under Penalty of Perjury of Valerie Crumbsy re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sonya Anderson. (Goldberg, Ralph) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge William M Ray II. (rlb) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER against All Defendants filed by Sonya Anderson.(Goldberg, Ralph) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 6/19/2019 to edit text (rlb). (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Anthony Smith. (rlb) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sonya Anderson. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8737726) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less