This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:46:48 (UTC).

Anderson v. Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Anderson filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Embry J. Kidd and John Antoon II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02307

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

Presiding Judge

John Antoon II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shaelis Anderson

Defendant

Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mary E. Lytle

Attorney at Lytle & Barszcz

533 Versailles Dr., 2Nd Floor

Maitland, FL 32751

David Victor Barszcz

Attorney at Lytle & Barszcz

533 Versailles Dr., 2Nd Floor

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant Attorney

Jose Ignacio Leon

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLC

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 3900

Miami, FL 33131-2153

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC. (Leon, Jose) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC. (Leon, Jose) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC. Related case(s): No (Leon, Jose) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#14

(#14) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC.(Leon, Jose) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#12

(#12) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/27/2019. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC. (Leon, Jose) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 12/27/2019 (DMA). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Shaelis Anderson. Related case(s): No (Lytle, Mary) Modified on 12/19/2019 (DMA). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Shaelis Anderson. (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#8

(#8) RETURN of service executed on 12/09/2019 by Shaelis Anderson as to Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC by Shaelis Anderson (Lytle, Mary) Modified on 12/16/2019 (DMA). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC. (DMA) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/9/2019. (counsel emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/9/2019. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Shaelis Anderson re #1 Complaint Civil Coversheet (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Shaelis Anderson. (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16226328) filed by Shaelis Anderson.(Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically. The parties may confer telephonically to prepare their case management report. If the parties are unable to agree on all matters to be included in the report, then the Court may require an in-person meeting of counsel to attempt, in good faith, to resolve all disagreements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/27/2020. (Kidd, Embry) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC. (Leon, Jose) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Interested persons order by Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC. (Leon, Jose) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC. Related case(s): No (Leon, Jose) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC.(Leon, Jose) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond. Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC, may have until and through January 13, 2020, to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/30/2019. (Kidd, Embry) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER for defendant. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/27/2019. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC. (Leon, Jose) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified on 12/27/2019 (DMA). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Shaelis Anderson. Related case(s): No (Lytle, Mary) Modified on 12/19/2019 (DMA). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Shaelis Anderson. (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of service executed on 12/09/2019 by Shaelis Anderson as to Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC by Shaelis Anderson (Lytle, Mary) Modified on 12/16/2019 (DMA). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued as to Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC. (DMA) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/9/2019. (counsel emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/9/2019. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#4) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-cv-2307-Orl-28EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Shaelis Anderson re #1 Complaint Civil Coversheet (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Shaelis Anderson. (Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Simonmed Imaging Florida, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16226328) filed by Shaelis Anderson.(Lytle, Mary) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less