This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 08:27:13 (UTC).

Anderson v. Schneider National Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Anderson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Schneider National Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Philip M. Halpern. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:22-CV-01689

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip M. Halpern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alishia Anderson

Poughkeepsie, NY 12601

Defendants

Schneider National Inc.

Scott Tomick

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Alishia Anderson. (sac) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Schneider National Inc., Scott Tomick. Document filed by Alishia Anderson. (sac) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Alishia Anderson. (sac) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#4

(#4) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Alisha Anderson consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Alishia Anderson. (sac) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/8/2022) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#7

(#7) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES: IT IS ORDERED that this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bono counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this order....this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program of mediation. Local Rule 83.12 shall govern the mediation, and the parties are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case....that the Clerk of Court shall locate pro bono counsel to represent the plaintiff at the mediation. The time to assign a mediator under Local Rule 83.12(f) shall be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent the plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process....that any objection by the plaintiff to either the mediation or to the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent the plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this Order. In the event the plaintiff files such an objection, the referral to mediation is vacated, and this case will not proceed to mediation. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/11/2022) (ate) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issue summonses for Schneider National Inc. and Scott Tomick, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for these defendants, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/11/2022) (ate) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Schneider National Inc., Scott Tomick. (sha) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#10

(#10) INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Alishia Anderson, at 170 Hudson Ave, Apt. 21, Poughkeepsie, NY 12601, on 3/11/2022 Re: #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, a copy of the Mediation Referral Order for Pro Se Employment Discrimination Cases, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (sha) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER: It is Plaintiff's obligation to provide the Court with an address for mail service, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a), but she has not done so. The Court therefore directs Plaintiff, within thirty days, to provide the Court with her new mailing address. The Court has warned Plaintiff once already that the Court may dismiss this action if Plaintiff fails to provide the Court with an address for service. (Doc. 8). Should the Plaintiff again fail to do so, this Action will be dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order, as well as the Court's March 11, 2022 Order of Service (Doc. 8) and Information Package (Doc. 10) to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/11/2022) (jca) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. Modified on 4/12/2022 (jca). (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#12

(#12) PRO SE MEMORANDUM, dated 4/12/22 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Alishia Anderson. New Address: 140 Hudson Ave., Apt. 21, Poughkeepsie, New York, 12601. (sc) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PRO SE MEMORANDUM, dated 4/12/22 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Alishia Anderson. New Address: 140 Hudson Ave., Apt. 21, Poughkeepsie, New York, 12601. (sc) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: It is Plaintiff's obligation to provide the Court with an address for mail service, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a), but she has not done so. The Court therefore directs Plaintiff, within thirty days, to provide the Court with her new mailing address. The Court has warned Plaintiff once already that the Court may dismiss this action if Plaintiff fails to provide the Court with an address for service. (Doc. 8). Should the Plaintiff again fail to do so, this Action will be dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order, as well as the Court's March 11, 2022 Order of Service (Doc. 8) and Information Package (Doc. 10) to Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 4/11/2022) (jca) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. Modified on 4/12/2022 (jca). (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceived returned mail re: #10 FRCP 4 Service Package - Mailed. Mail was addressed to Alishia Anderson at 170 Hudson Ave, Apt. 21, Poughkeepsie, NY 12601 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender, Unable to Forward. (ok) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Alishia Anderson, at 170 Hudson Ave, Apt. 21, Poughkeepsie, NY 12601, on 3/11/2022 Re: #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, a copy of the Mediation Referral Order for Pro Se Employment Discrimination Cases, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (sha) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 3/11/2022 Re: Judge Philip M. Halpern #8 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Complaint, Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Schneider National Inc., Scott Tomick. (sha) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Schneider National Inc., Scott Tomick. (sha) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to issue summonses for Schneider National Inc. and Scott Tomick, complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for these defendants, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/11/2022) (ate) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES: IT IS ORDERED that this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bono counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this order....this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program of mediation. Local Rule 83.12 shall govern the mediation, and the parties are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case....that the Clerk of Court shall locate pro bono counsel to represent the plaintiff at the mediation. The time to assign a mediator under Local Rule 83.12(f) shall be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent the plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process....that any objection by the plaintiff to either the mediation or to the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent the plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this Order. In the event the plaintiff files such an objection, the referral to mediation is vacated, and this case will not proceed to mediation. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/11/2022) (ate) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/8/2022) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Alisha Anderson consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Alishia Anderson. (sac) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Alishia Anderson. (sac) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Schneider National Inc., Scott Tomick. Document filed by Alishia Anderson. (sac) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Alishia Anderson. (sac) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schneider National, Inc is a litigant