This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:32:40 (UTC).

Anderson v. Pastuna et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Anderson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Pastuna. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel J. Albregts and Richard F. Boulware, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02098

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arnold Anderson

Ely, NV 89301

Defendants

Keith Bryant

Jennifer Kennedy

Gilberto Valenzuela

Jason Auschwitz

Christian Pastuna

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Ethan Matthew Freeman

Attorney at c/o Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89118

Robert W Freeman, Jr.

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Ste. 600

Las Vegas, NV 89118

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Plaintiff Arnold Anderson. Responses due by 2/7/2020. (JQC) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Jason Auschwitz, Keith Bryant, Jennifer Kennedy, Christian Pastuna, Gilberto Valenzuela. Replies due by 1/16/2020. (Freeman, Robert) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#12

(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendants Jason Auschwitz, Keith Bryant, Jennifer Kennedy, Christian Pastuna. (Freeman, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#11

(#11) MOTION for for Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiff Arnold Anderson. (ADR) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#10

(#10) OPPOSITION to Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Arnold Anderson. (ADR) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Oppose Defendant's Removal re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Plaintiff Arnold Anderson. (ADR) Modified event on 12/27/2019 (MMM). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#8

(#8) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Jason Auschwitz, Keith Bryant, Jennifer Kennedy, Christian Pastuna, Gilberto Valenzuela. (Freeman, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#7

(#7) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/6/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/21/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #7

Certificate of Service

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District - Clark County, Case Number A-18-782418-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5802960) by Keith Bryant, Gilberto Valenzuela, Christian Pastuna, Jennifer Kennedy, Jason Auschwitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service)(Freeman, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Plaintiff Arnold Anderson. Responses due by 2/7/2020. (JQC) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Jason Auschwitz, Keith Bryant, Jennifer Kennedy, Christian Pastuna, Gilberto Valenzuela. Replies due by 1/16/2020. (Freeman, Robert) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendants Jason Auschwitz, Keith Bryant, Jennifer Kennedy, Christian Pastuna. (Freeman, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for for Pretrial Conference, filed by Plaintiff Arnold Anderson. (ADR) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) OPPOSITION to Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Arnold Anderson. (ADR) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Oppose Defendant's Removal re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Plaintiff Arnold Anderson. (ADR) Modified event on 12/27/2019 (MMM). (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Jason Auschwitz, Keith Bryant, Jennifer Kennedy, Christian Pastuna, Gilberto Valenzuela. (Freeman, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/6/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/21/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (ADR) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SCREENING OF INMATE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) AND THE PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT by Defendants Jason Auschwitz, Keith Bryant, Jennifer Kennedy, Christian Pastuna, Gilberto Valenzuela. Responses due by 12/20/2019. (Freeman, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Jason Auschwitz, Keith Bryant, Jennifer Kennedy, Christian Pastuna, Gilberto Valenzuela. (Freeman, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jason Auschwitz, Keith Bryant, Jennifer Kennedy, Christian Pastuna, Gilberto Valenzuela. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Freeman, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District - Clark County, Case Number A-18-782418-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5802960) by Keith Bryant, Gilberto Valenzuela, Christian Pastuna, Jennifer Kennedy, Jason Auschwitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service)(Freeman, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less