This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/09/2021 at 08:37:39 (UTC).

Anderson v. Merchants Credit Guide Company

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Anderson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Merchants Credit Guide Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eleanor L. Ross and Christopher C. Bly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03238

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eleanor L. Ross

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda Anderson

Defendant

Merchants Credit Guide Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Neil Armor

Attorney at Armor Law, LLC

P.O. Box 451328

Atlanta, GA 31145

Matthew Thomas Berry

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 600, 2751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Merchants Credit Guide Company. (ceo) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Brenda Anderson (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Brenda Anderson. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brenda Anderson (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11171733) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ayw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/10/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Merchants Credit Guide Company. (ceo) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Brenda Anderson (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Brenda Anderson. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Brenda Anderson. (Berry, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Brenda Anderson (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11171733) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ayw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Credit Guide Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Neil Armor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew T. Berry