This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2021 at 07:26:55 (UTC).

Anderson v. Gallacher et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Anderson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Gallacher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jorge L. Alonso. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02715

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jorge L. Alonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua Topaz Anderson

Defendants

Ceci

A. Haberkamp

N. Schroeder

R. Martinez

M. Gallacher

Perry

C. Wilkins

Dentist

Dentist Assistant

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER: In response to Plaintiff's request for a status update #9 , the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the Court's June 23, 2021, order #8 , which denied Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for lack of indigence. The Court extends the deadline for Plaintiff to pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee to August 9, 2021. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this matter. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/16/2021. Mailed notice. (kl, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#9

(#9) LETTER from Joshua Anderson. (Envelope postmark date 7/6/21).(gcy, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #7 is denied for lack of a sufficient showing of indigence. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this case, he must pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee by July 19, 2021. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Court defers screening of Plaintiff's complaint #1 pending payment of the filing fee. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #3 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/23/2021. Mailed notice(exr, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Joshua Topaz Anderson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (Envelope not postmarked) (exr, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#6

(#6) LETTER from Joshua Anderson not dated. (Envelope not postmarked) (exr, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff initiated this lawsuit without pre-paying the $402.00 filing fee or submitting an in forma pauperis application. If Plaintiff wants to pursue this lawsuit, he must, by June 30, 2021, either: (1) pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee, or (2) seek leave to pay the filing fee in installments by submitting a properly completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (prisoner version), along with a copy of this order. The Court defers screening of Plaintiff's complaint #1 and ruling on his motion for attorney representation #3 until his filing-fee status is resolved. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/21/2021. Mailed notice (lma, ) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Joshua Topaz Anderson for appointment of counsel. (Attachments) (lma, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Joshua Topaz Anderson. (Envelope postmarked 5/17/2021) (lma, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAILED a copy of the Court's order dated 6/26/2021 #8 and a copy of the Court's order dated 7/16/2021 #10 to Joshua Topaz Anderson (kl, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: In response to Plaintiff's request for a status update #9 , the Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of the Court's June 23, 2021, order #8 , which denied Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for lack of indigence. The Court extends the deadline for Plaintiff to pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee to August 9, 2021. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this matter. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/16/2021. Mailed notice. (kl, ) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER from Joshua Anderson. (Envelope postmark date 7/6/21).(gcy, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAILED docket text of entry #8 to Joshua Anderson (dxb, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #7 is denied for lack of a sufficient showing of indigence. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this case, he must pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee by July 19, 2021. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Court defers screening of Plaintiff's complaint #1 pending payment of the filing fee. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #3 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/23/2021. Mailed notice(exr, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Joshua Topaz Anderson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (Envelope not postmarked) (exr, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER from Joshua Anderson not dated. (Envelope not postmarked) (exr, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAILED a blank application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (prisoner version), along with a copy of order #5 to Plaintiff. (lma, ) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff initiated this lawsuit without pre-paying the $402.00 filing fee or submitting an in forma pauperis application. If Plaintiff wants to pursue this lawsuit, he must, by June 30, 2021, either: (1) pre-pay the $402.00 filing fee, or (2) seek leave to pay the filing fee in installments by submitting a properly completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (prisoner version), along with a copy of this order. The Court defers screening of Plaintiff's complaint #1 and ruling on his motion for attorney representation #3 until his filing-fee status is resolved. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/21/2021. Mailed notice (lma, ) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Joshua Topaz Anderson for appointment of counsel. (Attachments) (lma, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Joshua Topaz Anderson. (Envelope postmarked 5/17/2021) (lma, ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dentist is a litigant

Latest cases where PERRY(B) is a litigant