This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2019 at 07:52:22 (UTC).

Anderson v. Board of Pardons and Parole et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2019 Anderson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Board of Pardons and Parole. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana L. Christensen and John Johnston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

Referral Judge

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Scott C. Anderson

Deer Lodge, MT 59722

Respondents

Board of Pardons and Parole

Attorney General of the State of Montana

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Mailed to Anderson (TAG) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS #4 in full. COA denied. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/4/2019. Mailed to Anderson (TAG) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Scott C. Anderson. #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma granted pauperis. Judge Magistrate Judge John Johnston termed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/14/2019. Mailed to Anderson (TAG) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Mailed to Anderson with docket sheet (TAG) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

2 #1

Account Statement

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Scott C. Anderson. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement) (TAG) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 not paid), filed by Scott C. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Mailed to Anderson (TAG) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS #4 in full. COA denied. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/4/2019. Mailed to Anderson (TAG) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Scott C. Anderson. #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma granted pauperis. Judge Magistrate Judge John Johnston termed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/14/2019. Mailed to Anderson (TAG) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Mailed to Anderson with docket sheet (TAG) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Scott C. Anderson. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement) (TAG) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 not paid), filed by Scott C. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less